This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2018 at 07:40:15 (UTC).

Acosta v. BG Healthcare Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Acosta filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BG Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00877

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. Alexander Acosta

Defendants

Benjamin Dele

BG Healthcare Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominique V. Sinesi

Attorney at Office of the Solicitor, Department of Labor

201 12Th Street, Suite 401

Arlington, VA 22202

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons for BG Healthcare Services, Inc. by R. Alexander Acosta. (Sinesi, Dominique) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to BG Healthcare Services, Inc., Benjamin Dele. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons for Benjamin Dele by R. Alexander Acosta. (Sinesi, Dominique) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BG Healthcare Services, Inc., Benjamin Dele filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pmil, ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to BG Healthcare Services, Inc., Benjamin Dele. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (pmil, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons for Benjamin Dele by R. Alexander Acosta. (Sinesi, Dominique) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons for BG Healthcare Services, Inc. by R. Alexander Acosta. (Sinesi, Dominique) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND WAIVER FORMS to be mailed to defts' for service (per cover letter filed with Complaint) (pmil, ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BG Healthcare Services, Inc., Benjamin Dele filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pmil, ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.