Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:31:43 (UTC).

Acker v. King

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Acker filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against King. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01844

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yolanda B. Acker

Waterbury, CT 06704

Defendant

Stephen King

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan M. Shapiro

Attorney at Shapiro Law Offices, LLC

32 Washington St.

Middletown, CT 06457

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION to Request Jury Trial by Yolanda B. Acker. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

17 #1

Exhibit A, Declaration of Jonathan M. Shapiro

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Manual Filing of copy of novel "Doctor Sleep" by Stephen King (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Jonathan M. Shapiro)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Stephen King re #14 Statement of Material Facts, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #15 Affidavit to pro se litigant (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT re #14 Statement of Material Facts, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment or motion to dismiss Signed By Jonathan M. Shapiro filed by Stephen King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Manually Filing, #2 Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Jonathan) Modified on 12/14/2018 (Gould, K.). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#14

(#14) Statement of Material Facts re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and motion to dismiss filed by Stephen King. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

13 #4

Exhibit C

13 #3

Exhibit B

13 #2

Exhibit A

13 #1

Memorandum in Support

#13

(#13) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen King.Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Shapiro on behalf of Stephen King (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Stephen King re #9 Electronic Service Documents,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

9 #1

Removal Standing Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stephen King, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Stephen King, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #3 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order filed by Stephen King, #2 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Stephen King, #5 Notice Concerning Previous Case filed by Stephen King Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Request Jury Trial by Yolanda B. Acker. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Manual Filing of copy of novel "Doctor Sleep" by Stephen King (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Jonathan M. Shapiro)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Stephen King re #14 Statement of Material Facts, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #15 Affidavit to pro se litigant (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT re #14 Statement of Material Facts, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment or motion to dismiss Signed By Jonathan M. Shapiro filed by Stephen King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Manually Filing, #2 Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Jonathan) Modified on 12/14/2018 (Gould, K.). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Statement of Material Facts re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and motion to dismiss filed by Stephen King. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen King.Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Shapiro on behalf of Stephen King (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Stephen King re #9 Electronic Service Documents,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal and Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stephen King, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Stephen King, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #3 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order filed by Stephen King, #2 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Stephen King, #5 Notice Concerning Previous Case filed by Stephen King Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2019. Discovery due by 5/11/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Stephen King Concerning Previous Case (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Stephen King Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Stephen King Statement Pursuant to Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standing Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Stephen King Notice of Pending Motions (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stephen King from Superior Court for the Judicial District of Waterbury, case number UWY-CV-18-5022544-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5044003, filed by Stephen King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Shapiro