This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2020 at 16:56:25 (UTC).

Access Now, Inc. et al v. Three Limes, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 Access Now, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Three Limes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-10999

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

R. David New

Stephen Theberge

Access Now, Inc.

Defendant

Three Limes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason M. Leviton

Attorney at Block & Leviton LLP

155 Federal Street, Suite 1303

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Suzanne E. Durrell

Attorney at Durrell Law Office

180 Williams Avenue

Milton, MA 02186

Mark D. Rasch

Attorney at Law Office of Mark Rasch

7919 Springer Road

Bethesda, MD 20817

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Access Now, Inc., R. David New, Stephen Theberge. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#16

(#16) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#13

(#13) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/03/2017 to File Answer to 10/03/2017 by Three Limes, Inc..(Rasch, Mark) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Rasch on behalf of Three Limes, Inc. (Rasch, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2017 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/14/17 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne E. Durrell on behalf of Three Limes, Inc. (Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Three Limes, Inc. served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 06/26/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Three Limes, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Three Limes, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6650482 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Access Now, Inc., R. David New, Stephen Theberge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leviton, Jason) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/6/2017) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia). (Entered: 05/31/2017)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Access Now, Inc., R. David New, Stephen Theberge. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Three Limes, Inc. answer due 10/2/2017. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/03/2017 to File Answer to 10/03/2017 by Three Limes, Inc..(Rasch, Mark) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Suzanne E. Durrell terminated (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Rasch on behalf of Three Limes, Inc. (Rasch, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Three Limes, Inc. answer due 9/5/2017. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2017 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Three Limes, Inc. answer due 8/14/2017. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/14/17 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Three Limes, Inc..(Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne E. Durrell on behalf of Three Limes, Inc. (Durrell, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Three Limes, Inc. served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 06/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Three Limes, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Three Limes, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6650482 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Access Now, Inc., R. David New, Stephen Theberge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leviton, Jason) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/6/2017) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia). (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less