This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:36:52 (UTC).

Acadia Insurance Company v. Hoffman Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Acadia Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hoffman Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen B. Molzen and Laura Fashing. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00812

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen B. Molzen

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acadia Insurance Company

Defendants

Hoffman Enterprises, Inc.

Trina A. Haslinger

Essex Homes Southeast, Inc.

Kinney Brick Company

Karl A. Haslinger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa M. Wilson

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202-3758

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acadia Insurance Company. Hoffman Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (for Declaratory Judgment) against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Acadia Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acadia Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for Acadia Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acadia Insurance Company. Hoffman Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Essex Homes Southeast, Inc.. (jg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Karl A. Haslinger, Trina A. Haslinger, Hoffman Enterprises, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acadia Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for Acadia Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5992678 re #1 Complaint filed by Acadia Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (for Declaratory Judgment) against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Acadia Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.