This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:40:13 (UTC).

A.C. et al v. Raimondo et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 A C filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Raimondo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00645

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aleita Cook

Keira Naomi Mendez Rivera

Musah Mohammed Sesay

Mealaktey Sok

Andrea Cahuec Cortez

Justice Womack

Lailani Mendez

Rylie Forcier

Isaiah Mendez

Nancy Xiong

Amaya Womack

Aidan Forcier

June Reser-Hinderer

Micah Santow

Defendants

Governor Gina M Raimondo

Rhode Island State Board of Education

Commissioner Ken Wagner

Senator Dominick J Ruggerio

Representative Nicholas A Mattiello

Council on Elementary and Secondary Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan G. Mickman

Attorney at RI Center for Justice

One Empire Plaza

Providence, RI 02903

Other Attorneys

Jennifer Louise Wood

Attorney at RI Center for Justice

1 Empire Plaza, Suite 410

Providence, RI 02903

Michael A. Rebell

Attorney at Center for Educational Equity

525 W. 120Th St., Box 219

New Yrok, NY 10027

Samuel D. Zurier

Attorney at Samuel D. Zurier, Esq.

55 Dorrance Street, Suite 400, 861-0200, Fax: 861-2922

Providence, RI 02903

Stephen M. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson & Clapham

123 Dyer Street, Suite 135, Suite 402

Providence, RI 02903-7115

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Dominick J Ruggerio waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Nicholas A Mattiello waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Gina M Raimondo waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Wagner. Ken Wagner waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Council on Elementary and Secondary Education. Council on Elementary and Secondary Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhode Island State Board of Education. Rhode Island State Board of Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

10 #5

Summons

10 #4

Summons

10 #3

Summons

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Rebell. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/29/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1292239 ), filed by M.S., K.N., M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mickman, Jordan) Modified on 11/29/2018 (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Dominick J Ruggerio waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Nicholas A Mattiello waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by M.S., K.N.M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. Gina M Raimondo waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Wagner. Ken Wagner waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Council on Elementary and Secondary Education. Council on Elementary and Secondary Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhode Island State Board of Education. Rhode Island State Board of Education waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Cottone, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Council on Elementary and Secondary Education, Nicholas A Mattiello, Gina M Raimondo, Rhode Island State Board of Education, Dominick J Ruggerio, Ken Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X., R.F.. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Rebell. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/29/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Michael A. Rebell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1292490 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: Civil Cover Sheet. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1292239 ), filed by M.S., K.N., M.R., A.C.C., A.C., J.W., L.M., A.F., M.S., A.W., N.X., J.R.H., R.F., M.M.S., I.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mickman, Jordan) Modified on 11/29/2018 (Potter, Carrie). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1292239 ), filed by Mealaktey Sok, Keira Naomi Mendez Rivera, Andrea Cahuec Cortez, Aleita Cook, Justice Womack, Lailani Mendez, Aidan Forcier, Micah Santow, Amaya Womack, Nancy Xiong, June Reser-Hinderer, Rylie Forcier, Musah Mohammed Sesay, Isaiah Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mickman, Jordan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less