This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 13:55:00 (UTC).

Abrams v. Jenkins, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 Abrams filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Jenkins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dennis Howell and Martin Reidinger. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann U. Abrams

Defendants

Daniel Lucas

Judith E. Jenkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Pinckney McGuire

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) ORDER that the Defendant's 61 Memorandum of Law in Support of his Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is STRICKEN. The Defendant may file a brief which complies with the requirements of this Court within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/31/2017. (khm)

#48

(#48) ORDER denying 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Accepting 46 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/03/17. (emw)

#33

(#33) ORDER granting 28 Motion to Set Aside 20 Clerk's Entry of Default and the Clerks Entry of Default [Doc. 20] is hereby SET ASIDE. The Defendant Four Seasons Landscaping, Inc. shall file its Answer to the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/24/2016. (kby)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER that the Defendant's 61 Memorandum of Law in Support of his Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is STRICKEN. The Defendant may file a brief which complies with the requirements of this Court within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/31/2017. (khm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER denying 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Accepting 46 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/03/17. (emw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting 28 Motion to Set Aside 20 Clerk's Entry of Default and the Clerks Entry of Default [Doc. 20] is hereby SET ASIDE. The Defendant Four Seasons Landscaping, Inc. shall file its Answer to the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/24/2016. (kby)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Pinckney McGuire