This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2018 at 07:02:37 (UTC).

ABF PIZZA, INC. et al v. CARELLI et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 ABF PIZZA, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CARELLI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABF PIZZA, INC.

SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC.

Defendants

TERESA CARELLI

GENE CARELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TODD M. BALES

Attorney at GORDON & BALES, P.C.

11 E. Second Street

Media, PA 19063

ANTHONY W. BROOKS

Attorney at THE WEBB LAW FIRM

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft Duquesne Blvd, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

JOHN W. MCILVAINE

Attorney at THE WEBB LAW FIRM

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft Duquesne Blvd Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

NANCY A. RUBNER

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Cira Centre, 12Th Floor, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

LESLEY M. GROSSBERG

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Cira Centre,12Th Floor, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/8/2018 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.3/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/7/2018 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.2/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GENE CARELLI AND TERESA CARELLI D/B/A SANTUCCI SQUARE PIZZA AND RESTAURANT'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN APRIL 28, 2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/26/2018.2/26/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171424.), filed by SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC., ABF PIZZA, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Uncontested) filed by GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI.Certificate of Service.(GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by LESLEY M. GROSSBERG on behalf of GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI with Certificate of Service(GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY A. RUBNER on behalf of GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI with Certificate of Service(RUBNER, NANCY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABF PIZZA, INC. re: DAVID ZIMMERMAN served Summons and Complaint upon GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI, by PERSONAL. GENE CARELLI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018; TERESA CARELLI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018; (kp, ) Modified on 2/20/2018 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF ANTHONY W. BROOKS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/29/2018. 1/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF JOHN W. MCILVAINE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/29/2018. 1/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#6

(#6) First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Anthony Brooks, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12591408.) filed by ABF PIZZA, INC..CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BALES, TODD) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

6 #2

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

5 #2

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John McIlvaine, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12591284.) filed by ABF PIZZA, INC..CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BALES, TODD) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 1,922,656, 1,907,754, 5,108,009. (rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/8/2018 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.3/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/7/2018 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.2/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS GENE CARELLI AND TERESA CARELLI D/B/A SANTUCCI SQUARE PIZZA AND RESTAURANT'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN APRIL 28, 2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/26/2018.2/26/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Uncontested) filed by GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI.Certificate of Service.(GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by LESLEY M. GROSSBERG on behalf of GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI with Certificate of Service(GROSSBERG, LESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY A. RUBNER on behalf of GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI with Certificate of Service(RUBNER, NANCY) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABF PIZZA, INC. re: DAVID ZIMMERMAN served Summons and Complaint upon GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI, by PERSONAL. GENE CARELLI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018; TERESA CARELLI served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018; (kp, ) Modified on 2/20/2018 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF ANTHONY W. BROOKS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/29/2018. 1/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF JOHN W. MCILVAINE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/29/2018. 1/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Anthony Brooks, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12591408.) filed by ABF PIZZA, INC..CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BALES, TODD) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John McIlvaine, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12591284.) filed by ABF PIZZA, INC..CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BALES, TODD) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 1,922,656, 1,907,754, 5,108,009. (rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ABF PIZZA, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ABF PIZZA, INC., SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC.. (rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Summons Issued as to GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on January 10, 2018 (rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GENE CARELLI, TERESA CARELLI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171424.), filed by SANTUCCI'S SQUARE PIZZA & PASTA IV, INC., ABF PIZZA, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.