This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:12:04 (UTC).

Abernathy v. Warden

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 Abernathy filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Corey C Abernathy

Chattanooga, TN 37422

Respondent

Warden

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/30/18. (copy mailed to Corey Abernathy at Silverdale along with IFP and Prisoner Account Statement forms) (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/14/19. (copy mailed to Corey C Abernathy at Silverdale along with 2254 form) (JBR) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey C Abernathy. (KFB, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

7 #2

Envelope Back

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter from Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Back) (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#6

(#6) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Abernathy re #4 Memorandum & Opinion. (Re-mailed to Corey Abernathy at Silverdale and included Inmate ID#203344) (JBR) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Letter from Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/14/19. (copy mailed to Corey C Abernathy at Silverdale along with 2254 form) (JBR) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey C Abernathy. (KFB, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • IFP forms mailed to Abernathy with inmate ID#203344 and ID# 236189 atSILVERDALE DETENTION CENTER P O BOX 23148 CHATTANOOGA, TN 37422. (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Back) (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corey Abernathy re #4 Memorandum & Opinion. (Re-mailed to Corey Abernathy at Silverdale and included Inmate ID#203344) (JBR) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BDG, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/30/18. (copy mailed to Corey Abernathy at Silverdale along with IFP and Prisoner Account Statement forms) (JBR) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Corey C Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.