This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 13:44:58 (UTC).

AbbVie Inc. v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2017 AbbVie Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01815

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AbbVie Inc.

Defendants

Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.

Grifols Worldwide Operations Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P. Frazier

Elissa Nicole Knoff

Michael A. Morin

Gregory K. Sobolski

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R. Bartlett

Katherine Nicole Clouse

William G. Gaede, III

Sherman W. Kahn

Michael Vincent O'Shaughnessy

Marc J. Pernick

Thomas P. Steindler

 

Court Documents

#53

#56

#75

#79

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 76 Clerk's Notice, Postpone Case Management Conference Pending Resolution of Arbitration filed by AbbVie Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER - REDACTED/PUBLIC Version of Docket No. 73 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING, 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay . Responses due by 7/7/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRIFOLS WORLDWIDE OPERATIONS USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AbbVie, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Frazier(Designation Retained)