This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

A. O. Smith Corporation v. Bradford White Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 A O Smith Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bradford White Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A. O. Smith Corporation

AOS Holding Company

Defendant

Bradford White Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

S Edward Sarskas

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew John Koopman

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

15 #4

Exhibit D

15 #3

Exhibit C

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bradford White Corporation- filed by A. O. Smith Corporation, AOS Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

14 #3

Exhibit 1, Assignment of U.S. Patent Application No. 11/464,998

14 #2

Declaration of Andrew J. Koopman

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Andrew J. Koopman, #3 Exhibit 1, Assignment of U.S. Patent Application No. 11/464,998, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin E. Leace - filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

5 #1

Certification of S. Edward Sarskas

#5

SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Edward Sarskas filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/18. (ntl) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,375,897;. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bradford White Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2342690.) - filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bradford White Corporation- filed by A. O. Smith Corporation, AOS Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED D.I. #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin E. Leace filed by Bradford White Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Andrew J. Koopman, #3 Exhibit 1, Assignment of U.S. Patent Application No. 11/464,998, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, D.I. #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 16, 2018 filed by Bradford White Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/12/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 16, 2018 - filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin E. Leace - filed by Bradford White Corporation. (Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Blaszkowski on behalf of Bradford White Corporation (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Koopman on behalf of Bradford White Corporation (Koopman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED D.I. #8 Proposed Procedures Order filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/3/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney S Edward Sarskas for A. O. Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • (#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/18. (ntl) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Edward Sarskas filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/18. (ntl) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Edward Sarskas - filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification of S. Edward Sarskas)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bradford White Corporation on 3/16/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,375,897;. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bradford White Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2342690.) - filed by A. O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRADFORD-WHITE CORPORATION A DE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where A. O. Smith Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew John Koopman