This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:38:33 (UTC).

A. K. v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 A K filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales, U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul R Cherry and William C Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00371

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul R Cherry

Presiding Judge

William C Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. K.

Defendants

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fred Schultz

Attorney at Greene & Schultz

520 N Walnut St

Bloomington, IN 47404

Donald H Slavik

Attorney at Slavik Law Firm LLC

2955 Village Dr Ste 16

Steamboat Springs, CO 80487

Defendant Attorneys

Chelsea Steele Hyslop

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46204-4236

Kevin C Schiferl

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46204-4236

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3730382.) from Whitley Circuit Court, Cause No. 92C01-1809-CT-000331, filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/15/2018. (mr) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Settlement Discussions, finding good cause shown. The Court ORDERS that this matter is STAYED pending early settlement discussions. The Court VACATES the preliminary pretrial conference set for 12/18/2018. The Court ORDERS the parties to FILE a status report on or before 3/18/2019. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/19/2018. (lns) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Counsel, Plaintiff and Defendant representative to attend. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/15/2018. (mr) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#7) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/14/2018. (mr) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. NEW CASE (kjp) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3730382.) from Whitley Circuit Court, Cause No. 92C01-1809-CT-000331, filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less