Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 06:25:13 (UTC).

7-Eleven, Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2013 7-Eleven, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Visa Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein, Margo K. Brodie and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:13-CV-05746

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judges

James Orenstein

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

Academy, Ltd.

Priceline.com, LLC

National RailRoad Passenger Corporation

Family Express Corporation

Petitioners

The Gymboree Corporation

The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc.

Thornton's Inc.

Mills Auto Center, Inc.

Aldo US Inc.

Express, LLC

Panera Bread Company

Meadowbrook, L.L.C.

Academy, Ltd.

Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Inc.

Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Foot Locker, Inc

Respondents

Mastercard Incorporated

Wells Fargo & Company

Citigroup Inc

FIA Card Services, N.A.

129 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey I Shinder

Attorney at Constantine Cannon, P.C.

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Adam Owen Glist

Attorney at Constantine Cannon, LLP

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gary J. Malone

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Jeffrey Isaac Shinder

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Brian R Strange

Attorney at Strange and Carpenter

12100 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent Attorneys

Gary R. Carney, Jr.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-3051

Keila D. Ravelo

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Robert P. LoBue

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Benjamin R. Nagin

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Thomas Andrew Paskowitz

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Jantra Van Roy

Attorney at Zeichner, Ellman & Krause LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

David John Fioccola

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Mark P. Ladner

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Michael B. Miller

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 West 55 Street

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

David T Moran

Attorney at Jackson Walker

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

Douglas P. Lobel

Attorney at Cooley LLP

11951 Freedom Dr, Suite 1500

Reston, VA 20190

David Alan Scupp

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

335 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

William R. H. Merrill

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (TX)

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Shuster

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

125 Broad Street, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Karen P. Anderson

Attorney at VeriFone, Inc.

88 W Plumeria Drive

San Jose, CA 95134

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#63

No Description Available

#6349

No Description Available

#178

No Description Available

#64

No Description Available

12 #7807

No Description Available

#116

No Description Available

#112

No Description Available

108 #6884

No Description Available

#101

No Description Available

#81

No Description Available

#75

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. Bank of America Corporation served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; FIA Card Services, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; MasterCard Incorporated, served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Mastercard International Incorporated served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Visa Inc. served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Visa International Service Association served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Visa U.S.A. Inc. served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Wells Fargo & Company served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013. Document filed by Willmar Motors, L.L.C.; Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc.; Barnes & Noble, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc.; Meadowbrook, L.L.C.; Drury Hotels Company, L.L.C.; Michaels Stores, Inc.; The Wet Seal, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc.; The Buckle, Inc.; Mills Motor, Inc.; Brainerd Lively Auto, L.L.C.; The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc.; Ralph Lauren Corporation ; Fleet Wholesale Supply Co., Inc.; Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc.; GNC Holdings, Inc.; Costco Wholesale Corp.; IKEA North America Services L.L.C.; Dillard's Inc.; Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited; New York & Company, Inc.; Express, L.L.C.; Thornton's Inc.; Academy, Ltd.; Euromarket Designs, Inc.; 7-Eleven, Inc.; Mills Fleet Farm Inc.; Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc.; Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc.; The Gymboree Corporation; Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.; Recreational Equipment, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc.; Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.; J. Crew Group, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc.; P.C. Richard & Son., Inc.; Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc.; Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.; American Multi-Cinema, Inc.; Foot Locker, Inc.; Aldo US, Inc.; Beall's, Inc.; Stein Mart, Inc.; Panera Bread Company; Genesco Inc.; Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.; Alon USA, L.P.; Mills Auto Center, Inc.; Gap, Inc.; Lowe's Companies, Inc.; Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shinder, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/17/2013)

6393 #16

Exhibit P) CCB Notice of appeal doc 6351 of 10/3/14 injunctive order

6393 #3

Exhibit C) Ltr of Class 11/16/13 doc 6088

#6411

No Description Available

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketORDER in case 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-VMS; granting (8432) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS; granting (71) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.; granting (72) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:16-cv-05507-MKB-VMS Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketORDER re 8424 Letter filed by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation - Class Plaintiffs' request for approval of 1st quarter 2021 tax payments for the Class I Cash Settlement Fund and Class II Interchange Settlement Fund is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Paymentech, LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase & Co.; Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Paymentech, LLC. (Bershteyn, Boris) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketORDER granting (8401) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS. On or before 2/26/2021, the parties will submit any issues to the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/22/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint,, by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (LoBue, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint,, by Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Ordway, Demian) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) Letter Regarding Answer to Elgin's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Citibank N.A., Citicorp Credit Services, Inc. (USA), Citigroup Inc Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS, 1:13-cv-05746-MKB-VMS (Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint,, by Citibank N.A., Citicorp Credit Services, Inc. (USA), Citigroup Inc. (Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#222) ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint,, by Mastercard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated. (Gallo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#221) ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint,, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A., FIA Card Services, N.A.. (Miller, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
284 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,. Bank of America Corporation served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; FIA Card Services, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; MasterCard Incorporated, served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Mastercard International Incorporated served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Visa Inc. served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Visa International Service Association served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Visa U.S.A. Inc. served on 7/9/2011, answer due 7/30/2011; Wells Fargo & Company served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013. Document filed by Willmar Motors, L.L.C.; Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc.; Barnes & Noble, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc.; Meadowbrook, L.L.C.; Drury Hotels Company, L.L.C.; Michaels Stores, Inc.; The Wet Seal, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc.; The Buckle, Inc.; Mills Motor, Inc.; Brainerd Lively Auto, L.L.C.; The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc.; Ralph Lauren Corporation ; Fleet Wholesale Supply Co., Inc.; Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc.; GNC Holdings, Inc.; Costco Wholesale Corp.; IKEA North America Services L.L.C.; Dillard's Inc.; Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited; New York & Company, Inc.; Express, L.L.C.; Thornton's Inc.; Academy, Ltd.; Euromarket Designs, Inc.; 7-Eleven, Inc.; Mills Fleet Farm Inc.; Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc.; Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc.; The Gymboree Corporation; Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.; Recreational Equipment, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc.; Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.; J. Crew Group, Inc.; Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc.; P.C. Richard & Son., Inc.; Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc.; Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.; American Multi-Cinema, Inc.; Foot Locker, Inc.; Aldo US, Inc.; Beall's, Inc.; Stein Mart, Inc.; Panera Bread Company; Genesco Inc.; Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.; Alon USA, L.P.; Mills Auto Center, Inc.; Gap, Inc.; Lowe's Companies, Inc.; Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shinder, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (pgu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:13-cv-03477-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Crate & Barrel Holdings, Inc. for Euromarket Designs, Inc.; Corporate Parent DDC Hotels, Inc., Corporate Parent DSW Industries, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Drury Development Corporation, Other Affiliate Drury Southwest, Inc. for Drury Hotels Company, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent The Aldo Group, Inc. for Aldo US, Inc.; Corporate Parent AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Dalian Wanda Group Co., Ltd. for American Multi-Cinema, Inc.; Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Genesco Inc., The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc.; Other Affiliate Biglari Holdings, Inc. for Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.; Corporate Parent Mills Properties, Inc. for Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc.; Corporate Parent Swarovski International Holding AG for Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited; Corporate Parent Nook Media LLC, Corporate Parent Nook Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation for Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.; Corporate Parent IKEA Holdings US, Inc. for IKEA North America Services L.L.C.; Other Affiliate Alon USA Partners, LP, Other Affiliate Alon Assets, Inc., Other Affiliate Alon USA Energy Inc. for Alon USA, L.P.; Corporate Parent Michaels Holdings, LLC for Michaels Stores, Inc.; Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc for Panera Bread Company, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.; Corporate Parent Roundy's, Inc. for Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Seven & I Holdings Co., Ltd. for 7-Eleven, Inc.; Corporate Parent Giraffe Holding, Inc for The Gymboree Corporation; Other Affiliate Associated Investors, Other Affiliate KKR & Co., L.P., Other Affiliate Academy Managing Co., LLC for Academy, Ltd.; Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Barnes & Noble, Inc.; Corporate Parent A.J. Richard & Sons, Inc. for P.C. Richard & Son., Inc.; Corporate Parent Chinos Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chinos Intermediate Holdings B, Inc., Corporate Parent Chinos Intermediate Holdings A, Inc. for J. Crew Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Express, Inc for Express, L.L.C.. Document filed by 7-Eleven, Inc., Academy, Ltd., Aldo US, Inc., Alon USA, L.P., Amazon.com, Inc., American Multi-Cinema, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Beall's, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, L.L.C., Costco Wholesale Corp., Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dillard's Inc., Drury Hotels Company, L.L.C., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Express, L.L.C., Fleet Wholesale Supply Co., Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., GNC Holdings, Inc., Gap, Inc., Genesco Inc., IKEA North America Services L.L.C., J. Crew Group, Inc., Meadowbrook, L.L.C., Michaels Stores, Inc., Mills Auto Center, Inc., Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., New York & Company, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son., Inc., Panera Bread Company, Ralph Lauren Corporation, Recreational Equipment, Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., Stein Mart, Inc., Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, The Buckle, Inc., The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, The Wet Seal, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Thornton's Inc., Willmar Motors, L.L.C..(Glist, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 07/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Case Designated ECF. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 06/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:13-cv-3477. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 06/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alon USA, L.P., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Chase Bank U.S.A., N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, L.L.C., Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Payments Services, Inc., Citigroup Inc., FIA Card Services, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MasterCard Incorporated,, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 06/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alon USA, L.P., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Chase Bank U.S.A., N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, L.L.C., Citibank, N.A., Citicorp Payments Services, Inc., Citigroup Inc., FIA Card Services, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MasterCard Incorporated,, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1070756)Document filed by Willmar Motors, L.L.C., Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Meadowbrook, L.L.C., Drury Hotels Company, L.L.C., Michaels Stores, Inc., The Wet Seal, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., The Buckle, Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, L.L.C., The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc., Ralph Lauren Corporation, Fleet Wholesale Supply Co., Inc., Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc., GNC Holdings, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., IKEA North America Services L.L.C., Dillard's Inc., Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, New York & Company, Inc., Express, L.L.C., Thornton's Inc., Academy, Ltd., Euromarket Designs, Inc., 7-Eleven, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., The Gymboree Corporation, Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., J. Crew Group, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son., Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., American Multi-Cinema, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., Aldo US, Inc., Beall's, Inc., Stein Mart, Inc., Panera Bread Company, Genesco Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Mills Auto Center, Inc., Gap, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(laq) (jd). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2013.] (Entered: 06/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Family Express Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Foot Locker, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Priceline.com, LLC is a litigant