Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:26:27 (UTC).

2430 South Havana, LLC v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 2430 South Havana, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia S. Krieger and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02352

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2430 South Havana, LLC

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher N. Mammel

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Linda Jane Knight

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Terence M. Ridley

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/19/18. (dkals, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2018. Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#19

(#19) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018. Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order AMENDED by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#15

(#15) Defendant Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

14 #1

Docket Sheet

#4

(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #9

State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet - 7-12-18

1 #8

State Court - Exhibit A to Complaint - 7-12-18

1 #7

State Court - Complaint - 7-12-18

1 #6

Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit E - Pertinent Page from Plaintiff's Estimate

1 #4

Exhibit D - Division of Insurance Producer Search

1 #3

Exhibit C - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel 9-7-18

1 #2

Exhibit B - Articles of Organization

1 #1

Exhibit A - Division of Insurance Letter

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/19/18. (dkals, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2018. Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018. Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Proposed Scheduling Order AMENDED by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Defendant Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Knight, Linda) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Knight, Linda) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond: Owners Insurance Company answer due 10/4/2018. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/27/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher N. Mammel on behalf of 2430 South Havana, LLCAttorney Christopher N. Mammel added to party 2430 South Havana, LLC(pty:pla) (Mammel, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • (#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/17/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#7) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Elizabeth Beebe Volz, District Court Judge, Arapahoe County on 09/04/2018.(dbera, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT to Compel Appraisal, for Breach of Contract, and For Statutory Relief against Owners Insurance Company, filed by 2430 South Havana, LLC.(dbera, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Ridley, Terence) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2018CV31655. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6295714), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Division of Insurance Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel 9-7-18, #4 Exhibit D - Division of Insurance Producer Search, #5 Exhibit E - Pertinent Page from Plaintiff's Estimate, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 State Court - Complaint - 7-12-18, #8 State Court - Exhibit A to Complaint - 7-12-18, #9 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet - 7-12-18, #10 State Court - Delay Reduction Order - 7-12-18, #11 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - 9-4-18, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Linda) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher N. Mammel