This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2021 at 15:51:45 (UTC).

USA v. Penn et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Penn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade and William E. Cassady. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CR-00020-5

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

Judge Details

Judge

Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

Buford Delaine Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S. Royal St., Rm. 600

Mobile, AL 36602

Sinan Kalayoglu

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S. Royal St., Rm. 600

Mobile, AL 36602

Erica R. Hilliard

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1100 Commerce Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75242

Gregory A. Bordenkircher

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S. Royal St., Rm. 600

Mobile, AL 36602

Defendant Attorney

Arthur J. Madden, III

Attorney at Madden & Soto

465 Dauphin Street

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#256

#87

#262

#257

#255

#154

#148

#147

#141

#135

#114

#107

#106

#105

#95

#84

#78

#77

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#262) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen appearing for USA. (Heisterhagen, Kasee) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Erica R. Hilliard appearing for USA. (Hilliard, Erica) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) ORDER as to Buford Delaine Davis GRANTING Govt's #255 Motion to Dismiss Indictment. All charges currently pending in the Indictment filed on 1/27/16 against Dft, Buford Delaine Davis, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/24/18. (tot) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #255 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Buford Delaine Davis to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by USA as to Buford Delaine Davis. (Kalayoglu, Sinan) (Main Document 255 replaced on 4/24/2018) (mab). (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) ORDER as to Buford Delaine Davis, Joint Oral Request that this action not be set on the trial calendar until such time as dft fails to qualify for pretrial diversion is GRANTED. DEFERRAL OF PROSECUTION allowed as to Buford Delaine Davis. Counts closed: Counts 1,34. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/17/2016. (tot) (Entered: 08/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Pretrial Conference as to Arthur Leyon Penn, Oleavia Mitchell Penn, Janice Marie Kirkland, Cynthia Maria Bivins, Buford Delaine Davis held on 8/15/2016 (Digital Court Recording) (eec) (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearings as to Arthur Leyon Penn, Oleavia Mitchell Penn, Janice Marie Kirkland, Cynthia Maria Bivins, Buford Delaine Davis: Supplemental Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2016 at 3:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady pursuant to #141 Order. (mab) (Entered: 08/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) Notice of Rule 404(b) Evidence by USA as to Arthur Leyon Penn, Oleavia Mitchell Penn, Janice Marie Kirkland, Cynthia Maria Bivins, Buford Delaine Davis, Charlotte Stallworth Davis (Kalayoglu, Sinan) (Entered: 08/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Order on Pretrial Conference held on 8/9/16 as to Buford Delaine Davis. Stipulations: Authenticity of all relevant busines records. Deft Conflicts: None; Govt Conflicts: Witness unavailable 9/15-9/23/16. Jury Selection before a Magistrate Judge consent form to be filed not later than 8/25/16. Trial scheduled for September 2016 criminal term w/Jury Selection set for 8/29/2016. ETT: 9 Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/11/2016. (tot) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #70 Certification Regarding the Preliminary Guideline Calculations of the Probation Officer as to Buford Delaine Davis to Judge Bivins. (tot) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Certification Regarding the Preliminary Guideline Calculations of the Probation Officer filed by Buford Delaine Davis. (Madden, Arthur) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Order on Arraignment as to Buford Delaine Davis (5) Count 1,34 - Jury Selection set for 4/4/2016 at 8:45AM. Pretrial Motions due by 3/9/2016. Probation Officers Report due 3/9/2016. Certification of Guideline Calculations due 3/8/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2016 at 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/24/2016. Copies to counsel, USPO, USMS. (mpp) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Docket(#50) CJA 20 APPOINTMENT for Buford Davis: Arthur Madden appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/24/2016. [See Evoucher] (mpp) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #46 Motion as to Arthur Leyon Penn (1), Oleavia Mitchell Penn (2), Janice Marie Kirkland (3), Cynthia Maria Bivins (4), Buford Delaine Davis (5), Charlotte Stallworth Davis (6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/24/2016. Copies to counsel. (mpp) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) JOINT MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA, Arthur Leyon Penn, Oleavia Mitchell Penn, Janice Marie Kirkland, Cynthia Maria Bivins, Buford Delaine Davis, Charlotte Stallworth Davis. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins in open court 2/24/16. (mpp) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit filed by Buford Delaine Davis in open court. (mpp) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketAttorney update in case: Attorneys Tim W. Fleming for Janice Marie Kirkland; Larry C. Moorer for Cynthia Maria Bivins; Arthur J. Madden, III for Buford Delaine Davis; Richard E. Shields for Charlotte Davis added. (mpp) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins:Initial Appearance & Arraignment as to Janice Marie Kirkland (3) Count 1,5-11,17,21-27,33,34 and Cynthia Maria Bivins (4) Count 1,2-4,18-20,34,37 and Buford Delaine Davis (5) Count 1,34 and Charlotte Stallworth Davis (6) Count 1,34 held on 2/24/2016. All dfts informed of rights & charges. All dfts appointed CJA counsel. All dfts released - Orders to follow. FTR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) INDICTMENT as to Arthur Leyon Penn (1) Count(s) 1, 2-16, 17, 18-33, 34-36, Oleavia Mitchell Penn (2) Count(s) 1, 12-16, 28-32, 34-36, Janice Marie Kirkland (3) Count(s) 1, 5-11, 17, 21-27, 33-34, Cynthia Maria Bivins (4) Count(s) 1-4, 18-20, 34, 37, Buford Delaine Davis (5) Count(s) 1 and 34, Charlotte Stallworth Davis (6) Count(s) 1 and 34. Forfeiture Allegation. (Attachments: #1 Penalty Page, #2 Signed Indictment) (jlr) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erica R. Hilliard - Federal Gov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen