This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/27/2022 at 06:32:03 (UTC).

Zentuary Group LLC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Zentuary Group LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Caryl E. Delano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-BK-02594

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Caryl E. Delano

 

Party Details

Debtor

Zentuary Group LLC

803 N Tampa Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - TPA

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Trustee

Kathleen L DiSanto

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

James W Elliott

Attorney at McIntyre Thanasides Bringgold, et. al.

500 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33602

Us Trustee Attorneys

J Steven Wilkes

Attorney at Office of United States Trustee

501 East Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Benjamin E. Lambers

Attorney at Timberlake Annex

501 E. Polk Street, Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: James Elliott, Ben Lambers, Carl Hognefelt WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (1) Initial Status Conference Subchapter V Case - Sub V - Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan and Setting Status Conference (form Doppsubv) - No action *(2) Continued Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (Elliott, James) Doc #15 - Interim Order Granting, continued to 10/3/2022 at 1:30 pm O/Elliott *(3) Motion to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (Elliott, James) Doc #32 - Granted, debtor to vacate bridge street property by 8/31/2022 O/Elliott Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#45

(#45) Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#44

(#44) Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#43

(#43) Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#42

(#42) Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (related document(s)#35). (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#41

(#41) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #38)). Notice Date 08/05/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2022)

#40

(#40) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #34)). Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#38

(#41) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #38)). Notice Date 08/05/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2022)

#35

A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order #35 is not indicated on the docket. James Elliott is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#34

(#40) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #34)). Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 07/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Deficient Filing. (Summary of Schedules, Schedules ABDGH, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet Not Filed) . (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#5

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 07/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/03/2022)

4 #2

Affidavit Verified Statement of Kathleen L. DiSanto

4 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedule EF, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. List of Equity Security Holders. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Zentuary Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 09/26/2022. (Elliott, James) Modified on 6/29/2022 (Jeffery). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: James Elliott, Ben Lambers, Carl Hognefelt WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (1) Initial Status Conference Subchapter V Case - Sub V - Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan and Setting Status Conference (form Doppsubv) - No action *(2) Continued Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (Elliott, James) Doc #15 - Interim Order Granting, continued to 10/3/2022 at 1:30 pm O/Elliott *(3) Motion to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (Elliott, James) Doc #32 - Granted, debtor to vacate bridge street property by 8/31/2022 O/Elliott Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on August 12, 2022. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Wilkes, J) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC (related document(s)#35). (Elliott, James) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #38)). Notice Date 08/05/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketA properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order #35 is not indicated on the docket. James Elliott is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #34)). Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #33)). Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 07/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Deficient Filing. (Summary of Schedules, Schedules ABDGH, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet Not Filed) . (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/29/2022 at 09:30 AM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 9/6/2022. (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Kathleen L. DiSanto. Kathleen L DiSanto added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Statement of Kathleen L. DiSanto) (Wilkes, J) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Elliott, James) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Caryl E. Delano, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Ellen M.) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Debtor Zentuary Group LLC. (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 8:22-bk-02594) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A70312353, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedule EF, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. List of Equity Security Holders. Filed by James W Elliott on behalf of Zentuary Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 09/26/2022. (Elliott, James) Modified on 6/29/2022 (Jeffery). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Steven Wilkes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin E. Lambers(Designation Retained)