This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:26:33

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Yolanda Ibarra in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 8:19-BK-14024
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 13
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Theodor Albert
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • US Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Trustee Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Yolanda Ibarra
  • Represented By
    • Sunita N Sood

Court Documents

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Yoland...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 1...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Sood, Sunita) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(8:19-bk-14024) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49925036. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Yolanda Ibarra. (Sood, Sunita) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Yolanda Ibarra. (Sood, Sunita) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Yolanda Ibarra. (Sood, Sunita) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Yolanda Ibarra Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Sood, Sunita) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.