This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2021 at 06:46:45 (UTC).

YF Aurora, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 YF Aurora, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-12914

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Debtor

YF Aurora, LLC

1350 E. Newport Center Dr., Suite 110

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.

6201 15Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Dennis A. Meloro

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Dennis Meloro

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Corrected PDF Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent. Signed on 11/10/2020 (LAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent. Signed on 11/10/2020 (LAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 20-12841. The docket in Case No. 20-12841 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 20-12841, Case No. 20-12842, Case No. 20-12843, Case No. 20-12844, Case No. 20-12845, Case No. 20-12846, Case No. 20-12847, Case No. 20-12848, Case No. 20-12849, Case No. 20-12850, Case No. 20-12851, Case No. 20-12852, Case No. 20-12853, Case No. 20-12854, Case No. 20-12855, Case No. 20-12856, Case No. 20-12857, Case No. 20-12858, Case No. 20-12859, Case No. 20-12860, Case No. 20-12861, Case No. 20-12862, Case No. 20-12863, Case No. 20-12864, Case No. 20-12865, Case No. 20-12866, Case No. 20-12867, Case No. 20-12868, Case No. 20-12869, Case No. 20-12870, Case No. 20-12871, Case No. 20-12872, Case No. 20-12873, Case No. 20-12874, Case No. 20-12875, Case No. 20-12876, Case No. 20-12877, Case No. 20-12878, Case No. 20-12879, Case No. 20-12880, Case No. 20-12881, Case No. 20-12882, Case No. 20-12883, Case No. 20-12884, Case No. 20-12885, Case No. 20-12886, Case No. 20-12887, Case No. 20-12888, Case No. 20-12889, Case No. 20-12890, Case No. 20-12891, Case No. 20-12892, Case No. 20-12893, Case No. 20-12894, Case No. 20-12895, Case No. 20-12896, Case No. 20-12897, Case No. 20-12898, Case No. 20-12899, Case No. 20-12900, Case No. 20-12901, Case No. 20-12902, Case No. 20-12903, Case No. 20-12904, Case No. 20-12905, Case No. 20-12906, Case No. 20-12907, Case No. 20-12908, Case No. 20-12909, Case No. 20-12910, Case No. 20-12911, Case No. 20-12912, Case No. 20-12913, Case No. 20-12914, Case No. 20-12915, Case No. 20-12916, Case No. 20-12917, Case No. 20-12918, Case No. 20-12919, Case No. 20-12920, Case No. 20-12921, Case No. 20-12922, Case No. 20-12923, Case No. 20-12924, Case No. 20-12925, Case No. 20-12926, Case No. 20-12927, Case No. 20-12928, Case No. 20-12929, Case No. 20-12930, Case No. 20-12931, Case No. 20-12932, Case No. 20-12933, Case No. 20-12934, Case No. 20-12935, Case No. 20-12936, Case No. 20-12937, Case No. 20-12938, Case No. 20-12939, Case No. 20-12940, Case No. 20-12941, Case No. 20-12942, Case No. 20-12943, Case No. 20-12944, Case No. 20-12945, Case No. 20-12946, Case No. 20-12947, Case No. 20-12948, Case No. 20-12949, Case No. 20-12950, Case No. 20-12951, Case No. 20-12952, Case No. 20-12953, Case No. 20-12954, Case No. 20-12955, Case No. 20-12956, Case No. 20-12957, Case No. 20-12958, Case No. 20-12959, and Case No. 20-12960. Signed on 11/10/2020. (LMC) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-12914) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 10049996, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corrected PDF Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent. Signed on 11/10/2020 (LAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent. Signed on 11/10/2020 (LAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 20-12841. The docket in Case No. 20-12841 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 20-12841, Case No. 20-12842, Case No. 20-12843, Case No. 20-12844, Case No. 20-12845, Case No. 20-12846, Case No. 20-12847, Case No. 20-12848, Case No. 20-12849, Case No. 20-12850, Case No. 20-12851, Case No. 20-12852, Case No. 20-12853, Case No. 20-12854, Case No. 20-12855, Case No. 20-12856, Case No. 20-12857, Case No. 20-12858, Case No. 20-12859, Case No. 20-12860, Case No. 20-12861, Case No. 20-12862, Case No. 20-12863, Case No. 20-12864, Case No. 20-12865, Case No. 20-12866, Case No. 20-12867, Case No. 20-12868, Case No. 20-12869, Case No. 20-12870, Case No. 20-12871, Case No. 20-12872, Case No. 20-12873, Case No. 20-12874, Case No. 20-12875, Case No. 20-12876, Case No. 20-12877, Case No. 20-12878, Case No. 20-12879, Case No. 20-12880, Case No. 20-12881, Case No. 20-12882, Case No. 20-12883, Case No. 20-12884, Case No. 20-12885, Case No. 20-12886, Case No. 20-12887, Case No. 20-12888, Case No. 20-12889, Case No. 20-12890, Case No. 20-12891, Case No. 20-12892, Case No. 20-12893, Case No. 20-12894, Case No. 20-12895, Case No. 20-12896, Case No. 20-12897, Case No. 20-12898, Case No. 20-12899, Case No. 20-12900, Case No. 20-12901, Case No. 20-12902, Case No. 20-12903, Case No. 20-12904, Case No. 20-12905, Case No. 20-12906, Case No. 20-12907, Case No. 20-12908, Case No. 20-12909, Case No. 20-12910, Case No. 20-12911, Case No. 20-12912, Case No. 20-12913, Case No. 20-12914, Case No. 20-12915, Case No. 20-12916, Case No. 20-12917, Case No. 20-12918, Case No. 20-12919, Case No. 20-12920, Case No. 20-12921, Case No. 20-12922, Case No. 20-12923, Case No. 20-12924, Case No. 20-12925, Case No. 20-12926, Case No. 20-12927, Case No. 20-12928, Case No. 20-12929, Case No. 20-12930, Case No. 20-12931, Case No. 20-12932, Case No. 20-12933, Case No. 20-12934, Case No. 20-12935, Case No. 20-12936, Case No. 20-12937, Case No. 20-12938, Case No. 20-12939, Case No. 20-12940, Case No. 20-12941, Case No. 20-12942, Case No. 20-12943, Case No. 20-12944, Case No. 20-12945, Case No. 20-12946, Case No. 20-12947, Case No. 20-12948, Case No. 20-12949, Case No. 20-12950, Case No. 20-12951, Case No. 20-12952, Case No. 20-12953, Case No. 20-12954, Case No. 20-12955, Case No. 20-12956, Case No. 20-12957, Case No. 20-12958, Case No. 20-12959, and Case No. 20-12960. Signed on 11/10/2020. (LMC) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJudge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by YF Aurora, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis A. Meloro