This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/20/2022 at 06:33:28 (UTC).

Wouaff Wouaff, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Wouaff Wouaff, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael G. Williamson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-BK-01595

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Michael G. Williamson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Wouaff Wouaff, LLC

4906 N. Manhattan Ave.

Tampa, FL 33614

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - TPA

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Trustee

Ruediger Mueller

Reunion, FL 34747-6784

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Marshall G Reissman

Attorney at The Reissman Law Group

1700 66Th Street N., Suite 405

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

Us Trustee Attorneys

Nicole Peair

Attorney at Timberlake Annex

501 E Polk Street, Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

Benjamin E. Lambers

Attorney at Timberlake Annex

501 E. Polk Street, Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #59)). Notice Date 06/15/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#59

(#59) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

58 #2

Mailing Matrix

58 #1

Main Document

#57

(#57) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Daimler Trust. (BK Servicing LLC (EG)) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#56

(#56) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Gabriel Silveira for Dbtr, Nicole Peair for USTEE, Ruediger Mueller Sub V Trustee WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (Heard by CED) (1) Cont. Hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B") (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #13 - Granted cont. use, Cont. hrg. set for 6/29 @ 1:30 p.m., order by Silveira *(2) Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Reject Leases with Mercedes-Benz Financial Services Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #33 - Granted, vehicles to be turned over w/in 7 days or other party to assume leases, order by Silveira *(3) Preliminary Hearing on Motion For Authority to Enter into New Premises Lease Agreement Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #42 - Granted, order by Silveira Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#55

(#55) Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral (related document(s)#13). Hearing scheduled for 6/8/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Marshall Reissman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

13 #3

Exhibit Exhibit "B"

#8

(#8) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference (Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/20/22). Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Susan M.) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#7

(#7) Application to Employ The Reissman Law Group, P.A. as Attorneys Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#6

(#6) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/11/2022 at 03:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/30/2022. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#2

Exhibit Verified Statement

2 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid). Schedules A, B, and D-H Not Filed. Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/20/2022. (Reissman, Marshall) Modified on 4/25/2022 (Juan). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022 (Montero, Juan). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#1

(#56) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Gabriel Silveira for Dbtr, Nicole Peair for USTEE, Ruediger Mueller Sub V Trustee WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (Heard by CED) (1) Cont. Hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B") (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #13 - Granted cont. use, Cont. hrg. set for 6/29 @ 1:30 p.m., order by Silveira *(2) Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Reject Leases with Mercedes-Benz Financial Services Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #33 - Granted, vehicles to be turned over w/in 7 days or other party to assume leases, order by Silveira *(3) Preliminary Hearing on Motion For Authority to Enter into New Premises Lease Agreement Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #42 - Granted, order by Silveira Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #59)). Notice Date 06/15/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Proof of Service of Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (related document(s)#55). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketA properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order #55 is not indicated on the docket. Marshall Reissman is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Daimler Trust. (BK Servicing LLC (EG)) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Gabriel Silveira for Dbtr, Nicole Peair for USTEE, Ruediger Mueller Sub V Trustee WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (Heard by CED) (1) Cont. Hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B") (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #13 - Granted cont. use, Cont. hrg. set for 6/29 @ 1:30 p.m., order by Silveira *(2) Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Reject Leases with Mercedes-Benz Financial Services Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #33 - Granted, vehicles to be turned over w/in 7 days or other party to assume leases, order by Silveira *(3) Preliminary Hearing on Motion For Authority to Enter into New Premises Lease Agreement Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Reissman, Marshall) Doc #42 - Granted, order by Silveira Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral (related document(s)#13). Hearing scheduled for 6/8/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Marshall Reissman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Proof of Service of Order Approving Application for Fixing Salary of Managing Member Retroactive to the Petition Date. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (related document(s)#51). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Proof of Service of Order Approving Amended Application for Fixing Salary of Managing Member Retroactive to the Petition Date. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (related document(s)#50). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketA properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order #51 is not indicated on the docket. Marshall Reissman is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference (Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/20/22). Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Susan M.) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application to Employ The Reissman Law Group, P.A. as Attorneys Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Reissman, Marshall) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/11/2022 at 03:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/30/2022. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Ruediger Mueller added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement) (Lambers, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Michael G. Williamson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Ellen M.) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Debtor Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. (Juan) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 8:22-bk-01595) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A69847776, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid). Schedules A, B, and D-H Not Filed. Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed. Filed by Marshall G Reissman on behalf of Wouaff Wouaff, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/20/2022. (Reissman, Marshall) Modified on 4/25/2022 (Juan). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022 (Montero, Juan). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin E. Lambers(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Peair