This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/19/2022 at 06:31:41 (UTC).

Welding & Fabrication, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Welding Fabrication, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott M Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-BK-10364

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Scott M Grossman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Welding & Fabrication, Inc.

1191 Ne 199Th Street

Miami, FL 33179

Trustee

Tarek Kirk Kiem

Greenacres, FL 33454

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aaron A Wernick

Attorney at Wernick Law, PLLC

2255 Glades Rd # 324A

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Us Trustee Attorney

Ariel Rodriguez

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #43 Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#44

(#44) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #41 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc., #43 Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#43

(#43) Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan (Re: #41 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.). Confirmation Hearing to be Held on 04/21/2022 at 02:30 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. Deadline for Service of Order, and Plan: 3/22/2022. Fee Applications Due: 4/7/2022. Deadline for Filing of Ballots: 4/14/2022. Objection to Confirmation Deadline: 4/18/2022. Affidavit due by 4/18/2022. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#42

(#42) Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning February 1, 2022 and Ending February 28, 2022 Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#41

(#41) Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#40

(#40) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc. (Re: #39 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#39

(#39) Notice of Filing Payroll and Sales Tax Reports, Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#38

(#38) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #37 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#37

(#37) Final Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Re: #9) (Grooms, Desiree) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#9

(#37) Final Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Re: #9) (Grooms, Desiree) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#8

(#8) Expedited Application to Employ Aaron A. Wernick and Wernick Law, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Filing Corporate Resolution in Support of Chapter 11 Filing, Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Financial Documents Required of Chapter 11 Small Business [Cash Flow Statement, Balance Sheet and Statement of Operations] Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 03/29/2022. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #43 Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #41 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc., #43 Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Order Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Subchapter V Plan (Re: #41 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.). Confirmation Hearing to be Held on 04/21/2022 at 02:30 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. Deadline for Service of Order, and Plan: 3/22/2022. Fee Applications Due: 4/7/2022. Deadline for Filing of Ballots: 4/14/2022. Objection to Confirmation Deadline: 4/18/2022. Affidavit due by 4/18/2022. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning February 1, 2022 and Ending February 28, 2022 Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc. (Re: #39 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Notice of Filing Payroll and Sales Tax Reports, Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #37 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Final Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Re: #9) (Grooms, Desiree) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#36) Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Rodriguez, Ariel) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral of U.S. Small Business Administration Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Expedited Application to Employ Aaron A. Wernick and Wernick Law, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Filing Corporate Resolution in Support of Chapter 11 Filing, Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Documents Required of Chapter 11 Small Business [Cash Flow Statement, Balance Sheet and Statement of Operations] Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Federal Income Tax Return of Debtor. [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Welding & Fabrication, Inc.. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-10364) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40327786. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 03/29/2022. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ariel Rodriguez