This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 01/02/2021 at 06:30:33 (UTC).

Welblen Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Welblen Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine Peek McEwen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-BK-08254

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine Peek McEwen

 

Party Details

Debtor

Welblen Holdings, LLC

1245 Court Street #102

Clearwater, FL 33756

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - TPA

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Trustee

Ruediger Mueller

Reunion, FL 34747-6784

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael C Markham

Attorney at Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP

401 East Jackson Street, Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Us Trustee Attorney

Nathan A Wheatley

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

501 E. Polk St., Suite1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Exhibit Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee

3 #1

Main Document

#2

#1

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Service Re: of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case to Additional Creditors Not Previously Noticed Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Welblen Holdings, LLC (related document(s)#14). (Markham, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(8:20-bk-08254-CPM) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 65912686, Amount Paid $ 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Schedules A - H, Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules. Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs, List of Equity Security Holders. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Welblen Holdings, LLC. (Markham, Michael) Modified on 11/18/2020 (Deanna). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #7)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #6)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #2)). Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 8:20-bk-08251-CPM (related document(s)#9). (Deanna) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:20-bk-08251-CPM with 8:20-bk-08252-CPM and 8:20-bk-08254-CPM. This case is associated with lead case 8:20-bk-8251. (Related Doc #8). Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deanna) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:20-bk-08251 with 8:20-bk-08252-CPM and 8:20-bk-08254-CPM Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Welblen Holdings, LLC (Markham, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Prescribing Consequences of Failure to File Timely Operating Reports. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Deanna) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Deficient Filing. (Summary of Schedules, Schedules ABDEFGH, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Statement of Attorney Compensation, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Not Filed) . (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2020 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 1/12/2021. (Jeffery H.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Welblen Holdings, LLC. (Markham, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Ruediger Mueller added to the case. Filed by Nathan A Wheatley on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee) (Wheatley, Nathan) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Laura G.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:20-bk-08254) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 65806743, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, List of Equity Security Holders. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Welblen Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 02/1/2021. (Markham, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2020 (Jeffery). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan A Wheatley