This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 05:06:42 (UTC).

Weil v. Harris

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Weil filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Victoria S. Kaufman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-AP-01039

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Victoria S. Kaufman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Weil

Defendant

Neal Harris

Trustee

Diane C Weil (TR)

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tamar Terzian

Attorney at Brutzkus Gubner

21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#2

AP-Summons

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Adversary case 1:21-ap-01039. Complaint by Diane Weil against Neal Harris. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint For: 1. Breach Of Contract; 2. Avoidance Of Fraudulent Transfers (Constructive Fraud); 3. Recovery Of Avoided Transfers with Summons Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Neal Harris Date Issued 7/9/2021, Answer Due 8/9/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diane Weil) Status hearing to be held on 9/15/2021 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (Gasparian, Ana) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 1:21-ap-01039. Complaint by Diane Weil against Neal Harris. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint For: 1. Breach Of Contract; 2. Avoidance Of Fraudulent Transfers (Constructive Fraud); 3. Recovery Of Avoided Transfers with Summons Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tamar Terzian