This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/16/2021 at 05:38:15 (UTC).

Weil v. Akhoian et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Weil filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Akhoian. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-AP-01032

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane C. Weil

Defendants

John Akhoian

Plumber Hero, Inc.

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

Trustee

Diane C Weil (TR)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony A Friedman

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Main Document

#2

AP-Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on John Akhoian Date Issued 6/15/2021, Answer Due 7/15/2021; Plumber Hero, Inc. Date Issued 6/15/2021, Answer Due 7/15/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diane C. Weil) Status hearing to be held on 8/18/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 1:21-ap-01032. Complaint by Diane C. Weil against John Akhoian, Plumber Hero, Inc.. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). - Complaint to (1) Avoid and Recover Fraudulent Transfer; and (2) to Preserve Recovered Transfer for Benefit of Debtor's Estate [11 U.S.C. 544 and California Civil Code 3439 et. seq. and 11 U.S.C. 548 and 550] - Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Friedman, Anthony) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less