This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2021 at 06:53:00 (UTC).

Wagyu 100, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Wagyu 100, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Bill Parker and Joshua Searcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-60039

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judges

Bill Parker

Joshua Searcy

 

Party Details

Debtor

Wagyu 100, LLC

P.O. Box 798

Mineola, TX 75773

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

Attorney at Eric A. Liepins, P.C.

12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorneys

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Operating Report for Filing Period 2/1/2021 to 2/28/2021 Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

22 #3

Service List Matrix

22 #2

Proposed Order

22 #1

Main Document

#21

(#21) DISREGARD ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR. Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (dd) Modified on 3/11/2021 (dd). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#20

(#20) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#19 Order Approving the Employment of Eric A. Liepins, P.C. as Primary Bankruptcy Counsel for the Estate. (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Wagyu 100, LLC). (vh)). Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#19

(#19) Order Approving the Employment of Eric A. Liepins, P.C. as Primary Bankruptcy Counsel for the Estate. (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Wagyu 100, LLC). (vh) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#18

(#18) Notice of Change of Address for Creditor Wood County Tax Office Filed by Wood County Tax Office (vh) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#17

(#17) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 6738.00 Amount Paid $ 6738.00 Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#6

(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (dd)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

5 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtf C/P

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Patrick K. Woods) , Request for Service of Papers & Certificate of Service Filed by MINEOLA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Woods, Patrick) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

2 #3

Service List

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Operating Report for Filing Period 2/1/2021 to 2/28/2021 Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) United States Trustee's Motion for the Approval of Chapter 11 Agreed Scheduling Order Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List Matrix)(Vardeman, John) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DISREGARD ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR. Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (dd) Modified on 3/11/2021 (dd). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 3/10/21 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#19 Order Approving the Employment of Eric A. Liepins, P.C. as Primary Bankruptcy Counsel for the Estate. (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Wagyu 100, LLC). (vh)). Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order Approving the Employment of Eric A. Liepins, P.C. as Primary Bankruptcy Counsel for the Estate. (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Wagyu 100, LLC). (vh) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Change of Address for Creditor Wood County Tax Office Filed by Wood County Tax Office (vh) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 6738.00 Amount Paid $ 6738.00 Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (RE: related document(s)#15 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC Document Due 02/18/2021. filed by Debtor Wagyu 100, LLC). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC Document Due 02/18/2021. (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting of Creditors - 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (dd)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (dd)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Wood County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (dd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors - 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (dd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Patrick K. Woods) , Request for Service of Papers & Certificate of Service Filed by MINEOLA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Woods, Patrick) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-60039) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11927515, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Wagyu 100, LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal