This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 05:16:55 (UTC).

Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-BK-14728

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Erithe A. Smith

 

Party Details

Debtor

Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Trustee

Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)

Orange, CA 92868

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Christopher J Langley

Attorney at Law Offices of Langley & Chang

4158 14Th St.

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz (Langley, Christopher) WARNING SEE DOCKET NO. 7 FOR CORRECTION. Modified on 12/6/2019 (Beezer, Cynthia). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

(#8) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/28/2020 at 09:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/25/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 02/14/2020. (Langley, Christopher) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Beezer, Cynthia). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • (#7) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judgewas reassigned due to prior case. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s) Judge Reassignment) (Beezer, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Judge Erithe A. Smith added to case per prior filing. Involvement of Judge Mark S Wallace Terminated (Beezer, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/28/2020 at 09:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/25/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 02/14/2020. (Langley, Christopher) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Beezer, Cynthia). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(8:19-bk-14728) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50226872. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz. (Langley, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Victor Manuel Rondon Diaz (Langley, Christopher) WARNING SEE DOCKET NO. 7 FOR CORRECTION. Modified on 12/6/2019 (Beezer, Cynthia). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less