This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/25/2020 at 06:31:47 (UTC).

VHN Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 VHN Services, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy . The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-41448

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

VHN Services, LLC

612 Fall Wheat Drive

Plano, TX 75094

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorney

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#21

#22

16 #4

Proposed Order

16 #3

Creditor Matrix

16 #2

Exhibits

16 #1

Main Document

10 #3

Exhibit A & B

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

Service List

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Main Document

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#21 Order Granting Motion for Approval of Rule 4001 Stipulation (RE: related document(s)#16 Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with BMO Harris Bank N.A., Filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits # 2 Creditor Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank N.A.). (pr)). Notice Date 08/23/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#22 Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 12/23/2020. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 04/22/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 08/23/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order Granting Motion for Approval of Rule 4001 Stipulation (RE: related document(s)#16 Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with BMO Harris Bank N.A., Filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits # 2 Creditor Matrix # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank N.A.). (pr) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 12/23/2020. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 04/22/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 08/10/2020 Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Agreed Order on Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To 2020 Kenworth Truck Filed by MHC Financial Services (Attachments: # 1 Service List # 2 Exhibit A & B # 3 Proposed Order) (King, James) Modified on 7/10/2020 (pr). filed by Creditor MHC Financial Services). (pr)). Notice Date 08/12/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #10 Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay UPLOADED 2020-08-10 13:05 (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #10 Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay UPLOADED 2020-08-10 08:28 (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Paul M. Lopez, Emily M. Hahn, Larry R. Boyd) Filed by COLLIN COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR/COLLECTOR (Lopez, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Agreed Order on Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To 2020 Kenworth Truck Filed by MHC Financial Services (Attachments: # 1 Service List # 2 Exhibit A & B # 3 Proposed Order) (King, James) Modified on 7/10/2020 (pr). filed by Creditor MHC Financial Services). (pr) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: James W. King) Filed by MHC Financial Services (King, James) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Creditor Rajiinder Verma Change of Address Filed by Attorney (Liepins, Eric) (dc). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd)). Notice Date 07/01/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 10/26/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/23/2020. (sd)). Notice Date 07/01/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 10/26/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/23/2020. (sd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by VHN Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-41448) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11652726, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 6717 Amount Paid $ 6717 Filed by VHN Services, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by VHN Services, LLC, Document Due 07/6/2020.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal