Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 06:35:52 (UTC).

Verity Medical Foundation et al v. TCPrince, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Verity Medical Foundation filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against TCPrince, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01438

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Verity Medical Foundation

400 Race Street

San Jose, CA 95126

Verity Health System of California, Inc.

2040 E. Mariposa Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Saint Louise Regional Hospital

9400 No Name Uno

Gilroy, CA 95020

Defendant

TCPrince, LLC

916 Sun Valley Drive

Woodland, CA 95776

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Dr Ste 400

St Paul, MN 55121

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figuerora Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

#3

Scheduling Order

3 #2

Order Re: Courtroom Procedures

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on TCPrince, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #5

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Verity Health System of California, Inc., Verity Medical Foundation (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures #2 Scheduling Order) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on TCPrince, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01438-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51645191. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01438. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation, Verity Health System of California, Inc., Saint Louise Regional Hospital against TCPrince, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAINT LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VERITY MEDICAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant