Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 06:38:49 (UTC).

Verity Health System of California, Inc. v. Sunquest Information Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Verity Health System of California, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Sunquest Information Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01454

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verity Health System of California, Inc.

2040 E. Mariposa Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant

Sunquest Information Systems, Inc.

3300 E. Sunrise Drive

Tucson, AZ 85718

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Dr Ste 400

St Paul, MN 55121

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figuerora Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

4 #3

Scheduling Order

4 #2

Order Re: Courtroom Procedures

4 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued on Sunquest Information Systems, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.) Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.) Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#2 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures #2 Scheduling Order) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued on Sunquest Information Systems, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.) Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of Verity Health System of California, Inc. against Sunquest Information Systems, Inc.. (RE: related document(s)#1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01454. Complaint by Verity Health System of California, Inc. against Sunquest Information Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01454-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51645191. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01454. Complaint by Verity Health System of California, Inc. against Sunquest Information Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania M Moyron

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.