This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/09/2022 at 06:30:26 (UTC).

Vanessa Stoller

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Vanessa Stoller was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10141

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Vanessa Stoller

Hidden Valley, CA 91302

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Matthew Abbasi

Attorney at Abbasi Law Corporation

6320 Canoga Ave., Suite 220

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee Attorney

Russell Clementson

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Order: 1. Setting General Bar Date; 2. Setting Deadline to File a Plan and Disclosure Statement; and 3. Continuing the Chapter 11 Status Conference. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 4/8/2022 (Garcia, Patty) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#52

(#52) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) (AMENDED) Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller. (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#51

(#51) Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller. (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#50

(#50) Proof of service of Court's Order on All Creditors and Interested Parties Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#41 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#49

(#49) Proof of service Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#47 Application to Employ Matthew Abbasi and Abbasi Law Corporation as General Insolvency Counsel with supporting declarations from Matthew Abbasi and Vanessa Stoller and Exhibits, #48 Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q))). (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

48 #2

Exhibit Application to Employ

48 #1

Main Document

#47

(#47) Application to Employ Matthew Abbasi and Abbasi Law Corporation as General Insolvency Counsel with supporting declarations from Matthew Abbasi and Vanessa Stoller and Exhibits Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#41

(#45) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#41 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Kogan, Michael. (Kogan, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#4

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual or Joint Debtors) (309E1)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 02/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

1 #3

CORRECTED PDF

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ntc of Case Deficient 521

#1

Main Document

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Order: 1. Setting General Bar Date; 2. Setting Deadline to File a Plan and Disclosure Statement; and 3. Continuing the Chapter 11 Status Conference. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 4/8/2022 (Garcia, Patty) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) (AMENDED) Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller. (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller. (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Proof of service of Court's Order on All Creditors and Interested Parties Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#41 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Proof of service Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#47 Application to Employ Matthew Abbasi and Abbasi Law Corporation as General Insolvency Counsel with supporting declarations from Matthew Abbasi and Vanessa Stoller and Exhibits, #48 Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q))). (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q)) Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#47 Application to Employ Matthew Abbasi and Abbasi Law Corporation as General Insolvency Counsel with supporting declarations from Matthew Abbasi and Vanessa Stoller and Exhibits Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Employ) (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Application to Employ Matthew Abbasi and Abbasi Law Corporation as General Insolvency Counsel with supporting declarations from Matthew Abbasi and Vanessa Stoller and Exhibits Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Abbasi, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#41 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#43 Notice of order req. filing of stat report and appear at stat conf or case will be dism or conv for failure to comp (BNC)) No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 03/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual or Joint Debtors) (309E1)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 02/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Kogan, Michael. (Kogan, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/9/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 6/8/2022. (Campbell, Fern) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Vanessa Stoller Case Number #12-14347, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 05/09/2012 , Standard Discharge on 12/19/2012.(Admin) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1738.00 by 16. Receipt Number 10076124. (admin) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Vanessa Stoller . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Vanessa Stoller Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 2/22/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 2/22/2022. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 2/22/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 2/22/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 2/22/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 2/22/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 2/22/2022. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 2/22/2022. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 2/22/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 2/22/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 2/22/2022. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 2/22/2022. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 2/22/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 2/22/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 2/22/2022. (Kinsley, Terri) Additional attachment(s) added (PAGES 3-4 to complete voluntary petition) on 3/14/2022 (Cetulio, Julie). Modified on 3/14/2022 (Cetulio, Julie). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clementson