This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/22/2021 at 08:18:49 (UTC).

Urquhart, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Urquhart, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua P. Searcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-60362

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Joshua P. Searcy

 

Party Details

Debtor

Urquhart, LLC

1087 Cr 3031

Carthage, TX 75633

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

Scott SEIDEL (SBRA V)

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William Stephen Shires

Attorney at The Law Office of Stephen Shires, PLLC

123 San Augustine Street

Center, TX 75935

Us Trustee Attorneys

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#33

#20

#19

18 #2

Declaration of Schedules

18 #1

Main Document

#12

9 #1

Main Document

#7

#6

#8

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2021 Filed by Urquhart, LLC (Shires, William) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#35 Order Striking Amended Schedules And/or Statements (RE: related document(s)#32 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC). (bd)). Notice Date 10/17/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Order Striking Amended Schedules And/or Statements (RE: related document(s)#32 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC). (bd) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference Held (RE: related document(s)#12 Notice of Status Conference Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188. Virtual Hearing scheduled for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYR Oct 05). Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 9/21/2021. (at)). (at) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 9/29/21 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Urquhart, LLC (RE: related document(s)#32 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC, #33 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC). (Shires, William) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix(# 21-60362) [misc,amdscall] ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12189516, amount $ 32.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING-DISREGARD ENTRY Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. (Shires, William) Modified on 9/23/2021 (JD). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#32) STRICKEN BY COURT ORDER ON 10/15/21: Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Adding Creditor Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/29/2021. (Shires, William) Modified on 10/15/2021 (bd). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Urquhart, LLC (RE: related document(s)#18 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule C, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/21/2021. (Shires, William) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021 (JD). filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC, #19 Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 09/21/2021. filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC, #20 Summary of Schedules Filed by Urquhart, LLC filed by Debtor Urquhart, LLC). (Shires, William) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice To Trustee Scott Seidel Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Christopher J. Dylla) Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division (Dylla, Christopher) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Meme L. Thomas) , Request for Service of Papers & Certificate of Service Filed by Panola County (Thomas, Meme) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 5000.00 Amount Paid $ 5000.00 Filed by Urquhart, LLC (vh) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) "Docketed in Error - Wrong Event - See Document number 8 for Correction." Certification of Attorneys Fees of Stephen Shires Filed by Urquhart, LLC (Shires, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Schedules: Schedule D,. Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 08/30/2021. (Shires, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (ERROR: INCORRECT "SCHEDULE" SELECTED - SEE DOCUMENT NO. 4 FOR CORRECTION) Original Schedules: Schedule E/F,. Filed by Urquhart, LLC Document Due 08/30/2021. (Shires, William) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bd). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Urquhart, LLC (Shires, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-60362) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12157652, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Urquhart, LLC, Document Due 08/30/2021.(Shires, William) Modified on 8/24/2021 (bd). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Salitore