This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 05:06:51 (UTC).

Upstream Capital Investments LLC v. Ramirez

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Upstream Capital Investments LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Ramirez. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-AP-01040

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Upstream Capital Investments LLC, Plaintiff

2522 Chambers Rd. #105

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant

Elsa V. Ramirez, Defendant

Mission Hills, CA 91345

Trustee

Diane C Weil (TR)

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynda E Jacobs

Attorney at American Debt Law

2522 Chambers Rd #100

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

3 #2

AP-Summons

3 #1

Main Document

1 #10

Exhibit EXHIBIT H

1 #9

Exhibit EXHIBIT G

1 #8

Exhibit EXHIBIT F

1 #7

Exhibit EXHIBIT E

1 #6

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

1 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

1 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

1 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

1 #2

Supplement AP COVER SHEET

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect Demand was entered. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC) (Fisher, Liliana) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued on Elsa V. Ramirez Date Issued 7/9/2021, Answer Due 8/9/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC) Status hearing to be held on 9/8/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Fisher, Liliana) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without electronic /s/ or holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT ADVERSARY PROCEEDING COVER SHEET WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC) (Fisher, Liliana) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 1:21-ap-01040-MT) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53148554. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 1:21-ap-01040. Complaint by Upstream Capital Investments LLC against Elsa V. Ramirez. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Supplement AP COVER SHEET #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Jacobs, Lynda) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynda E Jacobs