This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2019 at 05:06:48 (UTC).

Upstream Capital Investments LLC v. Hubbard, Jr.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Upstream Capital Investments LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Hubbard, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Bluebond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-AP-01244

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Upstream Capital Investments LLC, Assignee of Judgment Creditor Bobby Gossai

2522 Chambers Rd. #105

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant

Eugene Hubbard, Jr.

Long Beach, CA 90810

Trustee

Heide Kurtz (TR)

San Pedro, CA 90732

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lynda E Jacobs

Attorney at American Debt Law

2522 Chambers Rd #100

Tustin, CA 92780

Douglas A Crowder

Attorney at Crowder Law Center

350 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 190, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

3 #2

AP-Summons

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Supplemental (Cover Sheet for Adversary Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC. (Jacobs, Lynda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued on Eugene Hubbard Jr. Date Issued 7/30/2019, Answer Due 8/29/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC) Status hearing to be held on 10/1/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Complaint(2:19-ap-01244-BB) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49481884. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Supplemental (Cover Sheet for Adversary Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff Upstream Capital Investments LLC. (Jacobs, Lynda) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Adversary case 2:19-ap-01244. Complaint by Upstream Capital Investments LLC against Eugene Hubbard Jr.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynda E Jacobs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas A Crowder