This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 14:04:39 (UTC).

Unified Protective Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2019 Unified Protective Services, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-16482

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Frugard and the Class

Debtor

Unified Protective Services, Inc.

4431 West Rosecrans, Ste 200

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rita Leong

Attorney at GrahamHollis APC

3555 Fifth Ave Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92103

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

Us Trustee Attorney

Dare Law

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#230

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#160

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#92

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#91

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#90

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#89

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#50

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#46

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#10

(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#3

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

1 #3

Ntc of Case Deficient 521

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. (RE: related document(s) 4 Hearing (Bk Other) Set, #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 29 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #31 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (BNC-PDF), #40 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #41 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #46 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM filed by Creditor Delano Fields, #50 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 61 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, #89 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #90 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #91 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #92 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #93 Motion RE: Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., #160 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc., 190 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #230 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#247) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#245 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#246) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#244 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#245) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #240) for Michael Jay Berger, fees awarded: $2025.00, expenses awarded: $40.00 Signed on 4/29/2021. (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#244) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #234) for Michael Jay Berger, fees awarded: $16,776.50, expenses awarded: $613.59 Signed on 4/29/2021. (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#243) Declaration re: Declaration of Sherif Antoon in Support of Application for Payment of Final Fees of Jennifer M. Liu Filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#240 Application for Compensation for Jennifer M Liu, Accountant, Period: 10/5/2020 to 11/10/2020, Fee: $2,025.00, Expenses: $40.00.). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#242) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#240 Application for Compensation filed by Other Professional Jennifer M Liu) The Hearing date is set for 4/27/2021 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#241) Notice of Hearing Filed by Other Professional Jennifer M Liu (RE: related document(s)#240 Application for Compensation for Jennifer M Liu, Accountant, Period: 10/5/2020 to 11/10/2020, Fee: $2,025.00, Expenses: $40.00. Filed by Attorney Michael Jay Berger, Other Professional Jennifer M Liu). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) Application for Compensation for Jennifer M Liu, Accountant, Period: 10/5/2020 to 11/10/2020, Fee: $2,025.00, Expenses: $40.00. Filed by Attorney Michael Jay Berger, Other Professional Jennifer M Liu (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#238 Order on Final Decree and Order Closing Case or for an Order Closing Case on Interim Basis - Chapter 11 (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/25/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
236 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice to creditors(BNC-PDF): Order Setting (A) Principal Status Conference and (B) Procedures (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 7/2/2019 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (RE: related document(s) #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Setting (A) Principal Status Conference and (B) Procedures (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 6/3/2019 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Unified Protective Services, Inc.. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:19-bk-16482) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49151298. Fee amount 1717.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Unified Protective Services, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/17/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/17/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/17/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/17/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/17/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/17/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/17/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/17/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 06/17/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 06/17/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/17/2019. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 06/17/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/17/2019. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 06/17/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 06/17/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 06/17/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 06/17/2019. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFIED PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rita Leong