This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/16/2020 at 19:50:37 (UTC).

TooJay's Management LLC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 TooJay's Management LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Erik P. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-BK-14792

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Erik P. Kimball

 

Party Details

Debtor

TooJay's Management LLC

3654 Georgia Ave

West Palm Beach, FL 33405

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Amanda Klopp

Attorney at Akerman LLP

777 South Flagler Dr Suite 1100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Michael I Goldberg, Esq

350 E Las Olas Blvd #1600

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Karin Ingrid Warrner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1900 Sixteenth St, Suite 1700

Denver, CO 80202

Paul Steven Singerman, Esq

1450 Brickell Ave #1900

Miami, FL 33131

Eyal Berger, Esq.

350 E Las Olas Blvd #1600

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Michael Jordan Niles

313 N. Monroe Street Suite 301

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Jordi Guso, Esq.

1450 Brickell Ave #1900

Miami, FL 33131

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

395 #2

Exhibit "A"

395 #1

Main Document

#394

#393

#391

#333

#316

#298

#254

#253

#237

234 #4

Composite Exhibit C - Dr. Phillips Lease

234 #3

Composite Exhibit B - Wellington Lease

234 #2

Composite Exhibit A - Colonial Lease

234 #1

Main Document

17 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E

17 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

#1

514 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#395) Amended Response to (#298 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC, #316 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC) Filed by Creditor L & J Associates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (Kaplan, Dana) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#394) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC (Re: #393 Order on Motion to Establish Procedures). (Guso, Jordi) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#393) Order (I) Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Other Interests; (II) Authorizing and Approving the Asset Purchase Agreement; (III) Approving Procedures and Rights Related to Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; and (V) Granting Related Relief (Re: #237) (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#392) Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 9/8/2020 @ 9:30 am. This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** (Re: #333 Motion to Compel Debtor to Pay Post-Petition Rent Payments Filed by Creditor Oakwood Square (E&A), LLC) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC. (Leonard, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#391) Notice of Filing of Executed Asset Purchase Agreement, Proposed Sale Order (Exhibit D Thereto) and Intention to Request That the Court Proceed With the Hearing on Emergency Motion to Establish Procedures (I) Bidding Procedures, (II) Form and Manner of Sale Notice, and (III) Sale Hearing Date and (B) Authorizing and Approving (I) Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Claims, and Encumbrances, and (II) Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (ECF No. 237) at the Hearing Scheduled for September 8, 2020 at 9:30 A.M., Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC (Re: #237 Motion to Establish Procedures). (Singerman, Paul) (Entered: 09/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#390) Certificate of Service by Attorney Marc P Barmat (Re: #389 Objection filed by Creditor Premier Produce Central Florida, LLC dba Downtown Produce). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#389) Limited Objection to (#237 Motion to Establish Procedures (I) Bidding Procedures, (II) Form And Manner Of Sale Notice, And (III) Sale Hearing Date And (B) Authorizing And Approving (I) Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtors Assets Free And Clear Of Certain Liens, Claims, And filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC) Filed by Creditor Premier Produce Central Florida, LLC dba Downtown Produce (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Lieberman) (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#388) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC (Re: #387 Notice of Hearing by Video Conference Amended/Renoticed/Continued). (Guso, Jordi) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#387) Notice of Continued Video Hearing (Re: #237 Emergency Motion to Establish Procedures (I) Bidding Procedures, (II) Form And Manner Of Sale Notice, And (III) Sale Hearing Date And (B) Authorizing And Approving (I) Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtors Assets Free And Clear Of Certain Liens, Claims, And Encumbrances, And (II) Assumption And Assignment Of Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC (Guso, Jordi) Modified on 6/22/2020-to edit text and add SD code ., #333 Motion to Compel Debtor to Pay Post-Petition Rent Payments Filed by Creditor Oakwood Square (E&A), LLC) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference. (Leonard, Dawn) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#386) Limited Objection to (#237 Motion to Establish Procedures (I) Bidding Procedures, (II) Form And Manner Of Sale Notice, And (III) Sale Hearing Date And (B) Authorizing And Approving (I) Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtors Assets Free And Clear Of Certain Liens, Claims, And filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC) Filed by Creditor Apple Core Inc. d/b/a Jack Scalisi Wholesale Fruit & Produce (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Gavagni) (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
395 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) Final Order Authorizing Debtors' Use Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection. (Re: #17) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) Order Awarding First Interim and Final Application of Akerman, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Time Period of April 29, 2020 Through May 6, 2020 (Re: #131) for Eyal Berger, fees awarded: $86,548.00, expenses awarded: $54,357.50 (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) Order Granting Application to Employ Darren Gange as Investment Banker for the Debtor (Re: #232) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-14792) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36581765. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) Notice of Filing Redline of the Proposed Final Order Authorizing Debtors Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection, Filed by Debtor TooJay's Management LLC (Re: #17 Amended Motion). (Guso, Jordi) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] Proofs of Claim due by 07/8/2020. (Goldberg, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2020 (Cradic, Cameron). (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) Notice of Continued Hearing (Re: #234 Motion for Order Directing Payment of Administrative Rent Filed by Creditors WRI Wellington Green, LLC, WRI-TC Marketplace at Dr. Phillips, LLC, Weingarten Nostat, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A - Colonial Lease # 2 Composite Exhibit B - Wellington Lease # 3 Composite Exhibit C - Dr. Phillips Lease)) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2020 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Leonard, Dawn) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)