This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/02/2021 at 06:52:42 (UTC).

Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-40163

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC

12750 Pelzel Rd

Pilot Point, TX 76258

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gary G. Lyon

6401 W. Eldorado Parkway, Suite 234

Mckinney, TX 75070

Us Trustee Attorneys

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 A telephonic preliminary will be held on 4/6/2021 at 01:29 PM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas filed by Creditor TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. filed as document number #15.). Notice Date 03/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#18

(#18) A telephonic preliminary will be held on 4/6/2021 at 01:29 PM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas filed by Creditor TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. filed as document number #15. (Entered: 03/29/2021)

15 #8

Proposed Order Granting Motion of TLD McCutchin, Ltd. for Relief from the Automa

15 #7

Exhibit Ex F_Temporary Injunction

15 #6

Exhibit Ex E_Guaranty

15 #5

Exhibit Ex D_Promissory Note Modifications

15 #4

Exhibit Ex C_Special Warranty Deed with Vendor's Lien

15 #3

Exhibit Ex B_Deed of Trust

15 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Howard C. Rubin) Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Rubin, Howard) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Richard D. Pullman) Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Pullman, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Business Income and Expenses Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC Document Due 02/8/2021. (Lyon, Gary) Modified on 2/2/2021 (slt). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#1

Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021. filed by Debtor Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC). (pr) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 A telephonic preliminary will be held on 4/6/2021 at 01:29 PM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas filed by Creditor TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. filed as document number #15.). Notice Date 03/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 2/26/21 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) A telephonic preliminary will be held on 4/6/2021 at 01:29 PM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas filed by Creditor TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. filed as document number #15. (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Objection Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A_Promissory Note # 2 Exhibit Ex B_Deed of Trust # 3 Exhibit Ex C_Special Warranty Deed with Vendor's Lien # 4 Exhibit Ex D_Promissory Note Modifications # 5 Exhibit Ex E_Guaranty # 6 Exhibit Ex F_Temporary Injunction # 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion of TLD McCutchin, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay) filed by Creditor TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD.). (Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Operating Report for Filing Period February 1, 2021 to February 28, 2021 Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC (Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay(# 21-40163) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11979864, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property Located at Pelzel Road, Pilot Point, Texas Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A_Promissory Note #2 Exhibit Ex B_Deed of Trust #3 Exhibit Ex C_Special Warranty Deed with Vendor's Lien #4 Exhibit Ex D_Promissory Note Modifications #5 Exhibit Ex E_Guaranty #6 Exhibit Ex F_Temporary Injunction #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion of TLD McCutchin, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay) (Rubin, Howard) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#13 Order Approving the Employment of Gary G. Lyon as Attorney for the Estate (RE: related document(s)#11 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon As Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC . (slt)). Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order Approving the Employment of Gary G. Lyon as Attorney for the Estate (RE: related document(s)#11 Application to Employ Gary G Lyon As Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC . (slt) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021. filed by Debtor Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC). (pr) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt)). Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Howard C. Rubin) Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Rubin, Howard) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Richard D. Pullman) Filed by TLD MCCUTCHIN, LTD. (Pullman, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Business Income and Expenses Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC Document Due 02/8/2021. (Lyon, Gary) Modified on 2/2/2021 (slt). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-40163) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11928742, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Thunder Rain Holdings, LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021.(Lyon, Gary) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Salitore