This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/10/2022 at 06:34:02 (UTC).

The Grand 4141, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 The Grand 4141, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-11043

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Mark

 

Party Details

Debtor

The Grand 4141, LLC

1717 N Bayshore Dr., Apt. 4246

Miami, FL 33132-1180

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Stan L Riskin

20801 Biscayne Blvd # 506

Aventura, FL 33180

Us Trustee Attorney

Steven D Schneiderman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

29 #2

Mailing Matrix

29 #1

Main Document

#28

(#28) Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Re: #26 Certificate of Service). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#26

(#26) Certificate of Service by Attorney Stan L Riskin (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC, #25 Notice of Hearing). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#25

(#25) Notice of Hearing (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC.) Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 11:00 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Main Document

#23

(#23) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#19

(#22) Order Setting Briefing and Hearing (Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor HSBC Bank USA, NA as Trustee of the Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc., Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-OA1). Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 11:00 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC. (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

9 #2

Affidavit

#8

(#8) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Stan L Riskin. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #5 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/10/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/9/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/20/2022.) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

#5

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #5 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/10/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/9/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/20/2022.) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

#4

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Izad N Djahanshahi as to Corporate Authority Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#1

(#3) Affidavit of Izad N Djahanshahi as to Corporate Authority Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Certificate of Service by Attorney Stan L Riskin (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC, #25 Notice of Hearing). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Re: #26 Certificate of Service). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed in the Incorrect Case. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO WITHDRAW THE MISDOCKETED PLEADING AND FILE THE PLEADING IN THE CORRECT CASE WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. (Re: #26 Certificate of Service by Attorney Stan L Riskin (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC, #25 Notice of Hearing).) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate of Service by Attorney Stan L Riskin (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC, #25 Notice of Hearing). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Hearing (Re: #24 Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC.) Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 11:00 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Motion for Adequate Protection for the property at 1717 North Bayshore Drive #4141, Miami, FL 33132 Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order Setting Briefing and Hearing (Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor HSBC Bank USA, NA as Trustee of the Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc., Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-OA1). Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 11:00 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC. (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Joseph G. Paggi III, Esq. Filed by Creditor HSBC Bank USA, NA as Trustee of the Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc., Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-OA1. (Paggi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Corrective Entry (Re: #17 **SEE DE#19- REDOCKETED WITH CORRECT EVENT(s)**. Motion for Relief from Stay re: 1717 N. Bayshore Drive # 4141, Miami, Florida 33132Bad Faith Filing [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Creditor HSBC Bank USA, NA as Trustee of the Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc., Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-OA1 (Paggi, Joseph) Modified on 3/24/2022 .) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application to Employ Stan L. Riskin, Esq. as Attorney for the Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Stan L Riskin. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #5 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/10/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/9/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/20/2022.) Notice Date 02/12/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/10/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/9/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/20/2022. (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-11043) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40452272. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit of Izad N Djahanshahi as to Corporate Authority Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC). (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor The Grand 4141, LLC. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/20/2022. (Riskin, Stan) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Schneiderman(Designation Retained)