This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/19/2022 at 19:56:29 (UTC).

The Cajun Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 The Cajun Company, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Louisiana Western Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Kolwe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-50174

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Kolwe

 

Party Details

Debtor

The Cajun Company, Inc.

P. O. Drawer 51750

Lafayette, LA 70505-1750

Us Trustee

Office of U. S. Trustee

300 Fannin St., Suite 3196

Shreveport, LA 71101

Trustees

DIP

Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee)

400 E. Kaliste Saloom Road Suite 4200

Lafayette, LA 70508

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

H. Kent Aguillard

141 S. 6Th Street

Eunice, LA 70535

Caleb K. Aguillard

Attorney at H. Kent Aguillard Attorney at Law

141 S. 6Th St.

Eunice, LA 70535

Us Trustee Attorney

Gail Bowen McCulloch

300 Fannin, Suite 3196

Shreveport, LA 71101

Trustee Attorney

Armistead M. Long

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett

400 E. Kaliste Saloom Road Suite 4200

Lafayette, LA 70508

 

Court Documents

#238

(#238) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): #236 Order on Motion for Final Decree). Notice Date 12/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

237 #2

Final Decree Ch 11: Notice Recipients

237 #1

Final Decree Ch 11

236 #2

PDF8 - Dbt_ATY, TR_ATY, Pick O: Notice Recipients

236 #1

Main Document

#235

(#235) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $14,636.50. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 7 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $2933509.09, Assets Exempt: $0.00, Claims Scheduled: $3690299.25, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $3690299.25. Filed by Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee), Armistead) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

234 #1

Main Document

233 #2

Matrix

233 #1

Main Document

#9

#8

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

338 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): #236 Order on Motion for Final Decree). Notice Date 12/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketBankruptcy Case Closed (fris) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#237) Final Decree (fris) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) Order Granting (Re: #233 Motion for Final Decree filed by Debtor The Cajun Company, Inc.) (fris) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $14,636.50. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 7 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $2933509.09, Assets Exempt: $0.00, Claims Scheduled: $3690299.25, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $3690299.25. Filed by Armistead Mason Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Long (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee), Armistead) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) Reserved Hearing (Re: #233 Motion for Final Decree), IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 12/07/2021, 02:30 PM, at Courtroom Five, Lafayette with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Matrix) Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) Motion for Final Decree with Certificate of Service. Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Matrix) (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) Notice on (Re: #215 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan) Notice of Occurrence of Effective Date of the Confirmed Plan and Substantial Consummation, with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Matrix) Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) Notice on (Re: #215 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan) Notice of Occurrence of Effective Date of the Confirmed Plan and Substantial Consummation, with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Matrix) Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): #229 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). Notice Date 10/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
235 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application to Employ James L. Pate, Brandon W. Letulier, Jeffrey K. Coreil & Jed Mestayer of the firm of Neuner Pate as Special Counsel Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Resolution Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN, Picture ID Copy, Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest,, with Certificate of Service Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Pay for Interim Order Allowing Compensation and Compensation Nunc Pro Tuck for Insiders Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule with Certificate of Service Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion Requesting Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) and 331 of the Bankruptcy Code Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professions Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ H. Kent Aguillard and Caleb K. Aguillard as Attorneys Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Waiver of Delays Required by FRBP 6003 with Certificate of Service Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(21-50174) [petdoc,volp11a] (1738.00) (Re: Doc#1). Receipt Number 22027597, in the Amount of $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount Due $1738 Filed by H. Kent Aguillard on behalf of The Cajun Company, Inc.. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 03/29/2021. Employee Income Record for Debtor due by 04/9/2021. Schedule A/B due by 04/9/2021. Schedule D due by 04/9/2021. Schedule E/F due by 04/9/2021. Schedule G due by 04/9/2021. Schedule H due by 04/9/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 04/9/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 04/9/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 04/9/2021. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan due by 06/24/2021. (Aguillard, H.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cajun Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Armistead Mason Long