This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/14/2022 at 06:32:17 (UTC).

Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-BK-40323

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC

1803 Thomas Lee

Bonham, TX 75418

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

BEHROOZ (SBRA V) P. Vida

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A Liepins

Attorney at Eric A. Liepins, P.C.

12770 Coit Road, Suite 850

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorneys

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#53 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#54

(#54) Certificate of Notice Amended Filed By Marcus Salitore Filed by on behalf of US Trustee (RE: related document(s)#53 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

53 #3

Trustee Hearing Notice

53 #2

Proposed Order

53 #1

Main Document

#24

Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#24 A Status Hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/26/2022.). (ym) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

20 #3

Proposed Order

20 #2

Exhibit budget

20 #1

Main Document

#6

(#7) Certificate of Service Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Compel Return of Funds Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 3/17/2022 at 04:00 PM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 03/29/2022. (dc) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Main Document

#3

(#7) Certificate of Service Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Compel Return of Funds Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 3/17/2022 at 04:00 PM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

2 #3

Service List

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#24 A Status Hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/26/2022.). (ym) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#53 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#24 A Status Hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/26/2022.). (ym) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Held: Motion withdrawn on the record. (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). (ym) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Certificate of Notice Amended Filed By Marcus Salitore Filed by on behalf of US Trustee (RE: related document(s)#53 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On April 15, 2022 Filed by US Trustee (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). Final Hearing scheduled for 5/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (ym) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Stephen Rapp c/o Willian Whitehill (RE: related document(s)#49 Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Stephen Rapp c/o Willian Whitehill (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC, #43 Notice of Hearing Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). filed by Creditor Stephen Rapp c/o Willian Whitehill). (Storm, Abigail) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#20 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Stephen Rapp and First United Bank & Trust Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit budget # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/15/2022 at 08:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 5/24/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/12/2022. (sd) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice To Trustee Behrooz Vida Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Behrooz Vida)(Vardeman, John) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Service Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Compel Return of Funds Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 3/17/2022 at 04:00 PM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Compel Return of Funds Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 3/17/2022 at 04:00 PM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 03/29/2022. (dc) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Emergency Hearing On Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Compel Return of Funds filed by Debtor Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Compel Return of Funds Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-40323) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12377042, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Texoma Auto Remarketing, LLC, Document Due 03/22/2022.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Salitore