This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/31/2020 at 06:30:46 (UTC).

Tea Creations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Tea Creations, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Vincent P. Zurzolo and Neil W. Bason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-18041

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judges

Vincent P. Zurzolo

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Tea Creations, Inc.

154 W. Valley Blvd.

San Gabriel, CA 91776

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Leslie A Cohen

Attorney at Leslie Cohen Law PC

506 Santa Monica Bl Ste 200

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Us Trustee Attorney

Dare Law

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

5 #2

Proof of Service

5 #1

Main Document

#4

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending September 30, 2020 Filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Hearing Held on 09/29/20 at 1:00 p.m.: Continued to 10/27/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Only Lead Case to be Calendared - Joint Administration) (RE: related document(s) #1 Status Conference re: Chapter 11 Case) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). 341(a) Meeting Continued to 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. (Law, Dare) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents Filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#10 Order on Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/06/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 09/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#4 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/04/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/04/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/23/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 11/10/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/1/2021. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Hearing Set Status conference re: Chapter 11 case set for hearing September 29, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.; Place: telephonic (RE: related document(s)#1 #4 ) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appointment of Trustee Subchapter V Trustee; Proof of Service. John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Law, Dare) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order setting (A) Principal status conference and (B) Procedures....September 29, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 9/2/2020 (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. Case also remains deficient for Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 9/15/2020. Schedule I (Form 106I), Schedule J (Form 106J), Decl Re Sched (Form 106Dec) not required. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketJudge Neil W. Bason added to case due to prior case 20-14175 (Smith, Cynthia Joyce) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 9/15/2020. (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Tax Documents for the Year for 2019 Filed by Debtor Tea Creations, Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:20-bk-18041) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51667882. Fee amount 1717.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Tea Creations, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 09/15/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/15/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/15/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/15/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/15/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/15/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/15/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 09/15/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 09/15/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/15/2020. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 09/15/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/15/2020. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 09/15/2020. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 09/15/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/15/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 09/15/2020. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 11/30/2020. (Cohen, Leslie) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry no. 3 . Case also remains deficient for Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 9/15/2020. Schedule I (Form 106I), Schedule J (Form 106J), Decl Re Sched (Form 106Dec) not required. Modified on 9/2/2020 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie A Cohen