This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:11:12 (UTC).

Tatum Natisha Carter

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Tatum Natisha Carter in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-22136

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Tatum Natisha Carter

US Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

 

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tatum Natisha Carter (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/22/2019 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20237726. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Tatum Natisha Carter . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/22/2019 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tatum Natisha Carter (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.