This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/03/2020 at 07:16:42 (UTC).

Tailored Brands, Inc. and JA Apparel Corp.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2020 Tailored Brands, Inc and JA Apparel Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-33900

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

JA Apparel Corp.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

Tailored Brands, Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

Tailored Brands Gift Card Co LLC

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Renwick Technologies, Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

The Mens Wearhouse, Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

Tailored Brands Purchasing LLC

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Tailored Brands Worldwide Purchasing Co.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Joseph Abboud Manufacturing Corp.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

MWDC Holding Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

The Joseph A. Bank Mfg. Co., Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Moores The Suit People Corp.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

K&G Mens Company Inc.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

TB UK Holding Limited

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

TMW Merchants LLC

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Moores Retail Group Corp.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Tailored Shared Services, LLC

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Fremont, CA 94538

Nashawena Mills Corp.

6100 Stevenson Boulevard

Freemont, CA 94538

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew D Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Street, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Victoria Nicole Argeroplos

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Cameron A. Secord

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney St, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Jennifer F Wertz

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Us Trustee Attorneys

Hector Duran, Jr

Attorney at U.S. Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Stephen Douglas Statham

Attorney at Office of US Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Jason Lee Boland

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Julie Goodrich Harrison

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Steven William Golden

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Robert Bernard Bruner

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

752 #2

Proposed Order

752 #1

Main Document

#751

#750

#749

#748

719 #2

Redline

719 #1

Main Document

491 #1

Main Document

5 #3

Final Order

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Main Document

#3

Final Order

3 #2

Interim Order

3 #1

Main Document

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

1,011 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Motion to Sell(20-33900) [motion,msell] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22473190. Fee amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#752) Motion to Sell Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing (I) the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Real Properties Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, and Encumbrances and (II) the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Purchase Agreement Free and Clear of Liens as Described in Section 363(f). Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Fee Amount $181. Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#751) Declaration re: Declaration of Disinterestedness of FTI Consulting Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (Filed By Tailored Brands, Inc. ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#750) Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Sergio Arturo Vela. (Related document(s):#719 Amended Chapter 11 Plan) (mmap) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#749) Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 8/31/2020, $548,839 disbursed (Filed By Tailored Brands, Inc. ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#748) Declaration re: Declaration of Andrew Graiser in Support of Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of A&G Realty Partners, LLC as Real Estate Consultant and Advisor to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date (Filed By Tailored Brands, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#491 Application to Employ) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#747) Agreed Order and Certificate of Counsel (Filed By Tailored Brands, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#491 Application to Employ) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Redline) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#746) Motion to Seal / Motion of JAWHP LLC, et al for Order Authorizing JAWHP LLC to File Proof of Claim Under Seal Filed by Creditor JAWHP, LLC and WH Buyer, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#745) Sealed Document / Proof of Claim of JAWHP, LLC, WH Buyer LLC, and each of their affiliates and certain related persons (Unredacted) (Filed By JAWHP, LLC and WH Buyer, LLC ). (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#744) Certificate of Service (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors ).(Related document(s):#742 Application to Employ) (Boland, Jason) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
743 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Prime Clerk LLP as Claims, Noticing, and Solicitation Agent Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Steele #2 Proposed Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of an Order Authorizing Moors the Suit People Corp. to Act as Foreign Representative Pursant to 11 U.S.C. 1505 Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Maintain the Surety Bond Program Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Interim Order #2 Final Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of (I) Non-Merchandise Critical Vendors and (II) Foreign Vendors Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Interim Order #2 Final Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of (I) Lien Claimants and (II) Import Claimants Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Interim Order #2 Final Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Current Income and Expenditures, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Maintain and Administer Their Existing Customer Programs and Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Interim Order #2 Final Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency Motion Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Tailored Brands, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2020 at 04:30 PM at telephone and video conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-33900) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22322724. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Tailored Brands, Inc.. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tailored Shared Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mens Wearhouse Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS INC. is a litigant