This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/10/2022 at 06:32:06 (UTC).

Sungard AS New Holdings III, LLC Jointly Administered under 22-90018.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Sungard AS New Holdings III, LLC Jointly Administered under 22-90018 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-BK-90022

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

Sungard AS New Holdings III, LLC

565 E. Swedesford Road, Suite 320

Wayne, PA 19087

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jennifer F Wertz

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sungard AS New Holdings III, LLC. (Wertz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 22-90018. Signed on 4/11/2022 (aalo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#4) No Creditor Mailing List (SierraThomasAnderson) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 22-90018 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aalo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 22-90018. Signed on 4/11/2022 (aalo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-90022) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23642707. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sungard AS New Holdings III, LLC. (Wertz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer F Wertz