This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 11:00:58 (UTC).

Studio Production Center, Inc. et al v. Imagecraft Productions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2019 Studio Production Center, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Imagecraft Productions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah J. Saltzman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-AP-01145

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah J. Saltzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Studio Production Center, Inc.

6320 Canoga Ave., 15Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Ridgley Conlan

Wilmington, NY 12997

Defendant

Imagecraft Productions, Inc.

3318 Burton Ave.

Burbank, CA 91501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Brian Lally

Attorney at Law Office of David B. Lally

Po Box 355

Wilmington, NY 12997

Defendant Attorneys

Dean G Rallis, Jr

Attorney at Hahn & Hahn LLP

301 E. Colorado Blvd., 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101-1977

Matthew D Pham

Attorney at Hahn & Hahn LLP

301 E. Colorado Blvd., 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101-1977

 

Court Documents

#22

No Description Available

#8

(#10) Order Granting Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant to Continue Hearing on Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to January 28, 2020 at 11AM; (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #8 ) Signed on 1/8/2020 (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

4 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Service Executed on Imagecraft Productions, Inc. 12/10/2019 (Lally, David) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

AP-Summons

#1

(#34) Hearing NOT Held/Status Conference re #1 Complaint For Declaratory Relief Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment) - Continued by Stip. to 3/10/20 at 11am (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#37

(#37) ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Per Stipulation; (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/28/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, #4 Motion for a temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, #30 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc., #33 Transcript). (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#36

(#36) Stipulation By Imagecraft Productions, Inc. and Studio Production Center, Inc., and Ridgely Conlan aka Ridge Conlan Regarding Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Rallis, Dean) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#33

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#30

(#30) Motion Notice of Motion and Motion for More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Pham, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#25

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Notice of lodgment of Order Approving Stipulation Extending the Deadline To Respond to the Adversary Complaint, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#6 Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant Extending the Deadline To Respond to The Complaint For Declaratory Relief, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan). (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#7) Notice of lodgment of Order Approving Stipulation Extending the Deadline To Respond to the Adversary Complaint, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#6 Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant Extending the Deadline To Respond to The Complaint For Declaratory Relief, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan). (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

2 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • Docket(#39) Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1145 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#37 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/01/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Per Stipulation; (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/28/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, #4 Motion for a temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, #30 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc., #33 Transcript). (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Stipulation By Imagecraft Productions, Inc. and Studio Production Center, Inc., and Ridgely Conlan aka Ridge Conlan Regarding Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Rallis, Dean) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Docket event was incorrectly selected for filings requiring no filing fee, however, the document filed indicates that a $350.00 filing fee is due. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan) (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Hearing NOT Held/Status Conference re #1 Complaint For Declaratory Relief Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment) - Continued by Stip. to 3/10/20 at 11am (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/28/20 RE: In Re: Studio Production Center, Inc.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 05/18/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Ben Hyatt Corporation, Telephone number 8882720022.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/24/2020. Redaction Request Due By 03/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/19/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/18/2020. (Hyatt, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#30 Motion for More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief;filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#29 Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Motion Notice of Motion and Motion for More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Pham, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order Granting Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant to Continue Hearing on Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to January 28, 2020 at 11AM; (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #8 ) Signed on 1/8/2020 (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of lodgment Of Order Approving Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#8 Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant to Continue Hearing on Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, for Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, Debtor's CEO, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan). (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant to Continue Hearing on Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, for Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan, Debtor's CEO, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of lodgment of Order Approving Stipulation Extending the Deadline To Respond to the Adversary Complaint, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#6 Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant Extending the Deadline To Respond to The Complaint For Declaratory Relief, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan). (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulation By Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. and Defendant Extending the Deadline To Respond to The Complaint For Declaratory Relief, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (Lally, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion for a temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan) The Hearing date is set for 1/15/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for a temporary restraining order Notice of Application and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction For Ridgley Conlan, Debtor's Chief Executive Officer, Declaration of Ridgley Conlan, with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiffs Ridgley Conlan, Studio Production Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lally, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Service Executed on Imagecraft Productions, Inc. 12/10/2019 (Lally, David) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued on Imagecraft Productions, Inc. Date Issued 12/9/2019, Answer Due 1/8/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Studio Production Center, Inc., Plaintiff Ridgley Conlan) Status hearing to be held on 2/20/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Adversary case 1:19-ap-01145. Complaint by Studio Production Center, Inc., Ridgley Conlan against Imagecraft Productions, Inc.. (Fee Not Required). Complaint For Declaratory Relief Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Lally, David) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imagecraft Productions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Studio Production Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean G Rallis, Jr