This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/14/2022 at 06:31:50 (UTC).

Stimwave Technologies Incorporated

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Stimwave Technologies Incorporated was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Owens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10541

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen B. Owens

 

Party Details

Debtor

Stimwave Technologies Incorporated

1310 Park Central Blvd S.

Pompano Beach, FL 33064

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

Not Classified By Court

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC

55 East 52Nd Street, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10055

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Stimwave Technologies Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jared W Kochenash

Attorney at Young Conaway

1000 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew L Magaziner

Attorney at Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Dylan S. Cassidy

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Michael G. Farag

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric T. Haitz

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Elizabeth Soper Justison

Attorney at Young Conaway

1000 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert A. Klyman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rebecca C. Martin

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Us Trustee Attorney

Benjamin A. Hackman

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

844 King Street, Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Benjamin Joseph Steele

Attorney at Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC

55 East 52Nd Street, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10055

Robert W. Dremluk

Attorney at CULHANE MEADOW, PLLC

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10166

Robert Walter Dremluk

Attorney at Culhane Meadlows, PLLC

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10166

Mette H. Kurth

Attorney at Culhane Meadows PLLC

3411 Silverside Road, Baynard Building

Wilmington, DE 19810

S. Saliya Subasinghe

Attorney at Culhane Meadows, PLLC

823 Congress Avenue, Ste. 300

Austin, TX 78701

Lynnette R Warman

Attorney at Culhane Meadows PLLC

13101 Preston Road, Ste. 110-1593

Dallas, TX 75240

 

Court Documents

#246

(#246) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Tariful Huf Regarding Notice of Filing of Amendment to Stalking Horse Agreement. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#231) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#245

(#245) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Moheen Ahmad Regarding Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#214, #215) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#244

(#244) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Dylan S. Cassidy has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

243 #3

Exhibit

243 #2

Notice

243 #1

Main Document

#231

(#246) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Tariful Huf Regarding Notice of Filing of Amendment to Stalking Horse Agreement. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#231) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#215

(#245) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Moheen Ahmad Regarding Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#214, #215) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#214

(#245) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Moheen Ahmad Regarding Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#214, #215) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#9

(#9) Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Lien Claimants; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#8

(#8) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts - Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continued (A) Use of Cash Management System, (B) Use of Prepetition Bank Accounts and Certain Payment Methods, and (C) Performance of Intercompany Transactions in the Ordinary Course of Business and Granting Administrative Expense Status for Postpetition Intercompany Claims; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#7

(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Prepetition Insurance Policies and Pay All Prepetition Obligations in Respect Thereof and (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor Related Checks and Transfers Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Discontinuing, Altering, or Refusing Service, (II) Deeming Utility Companies to Have Adequate Assurance of Future Payment, (III) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Requests for Additional Assurance, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes - Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor All Related Checks and Electronic Payment Requests Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent KROLL RESTRUCTURING ADMINISTRATION LLC Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Motion for Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#2

(#2) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion - Declaration of Aure Bruneau in Support of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Requests for First Day Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

319 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#246) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Tariful Huf Regarding Notice of Filing of Amendment to Stalking Horse Agreement. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#231) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#245) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Moheen Ahmad Regarding Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Notice of Filing of Proposed Redacted Version of Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (related document(s)#214, #215) (Malo, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#244) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Dylan S. Cassidy has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#243) First Application for Compensation for Servies of Riveron RTS, LLC for the period June 15, 2022 to July 31, 2022 Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. Objections due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#242) First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Honigman LLP for the period June 15, 2022 to July 31, 2022 Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. Objections due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#241) First Application for Compensation for Services Rendered of Jones Day for the period June 15, 2022 to July 31, 2022 Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. Objections due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period June 15, 2022 to July 31, 2022 Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. Objections due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit) (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP for the period June 15, 2022 to July 31, 2022 Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. Objections due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) Order Approving Stipulation With JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Application of Funds (related document(s)#237) Order Signed on 8/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mml) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#237) Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Between Debtors and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Authorizing Incurring of Secured Credit and Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Funding of Cash Security and Application of Funds Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Lien Claimants; (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts - Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continued (A) Use of Cash Management System, (B) Use of Prepetition Bank Accounts and Certain Payment Methods, and (C) Performance of Intercompany Transactions in the Ordinary Course of Business and Granting Administrative Expense Status for Postpetition Intercompany Claims; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Prepetition Insurance Policies and Pay All Prepetition Obligations in Respect Thereof and (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor Related Checks and Transfers Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service - Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Discontinuing, Altering, or Refusing Service, (II) Deeming Utility Companies to Have Adequate Assurance of Future Payment, (III) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Requests for Additional Assurance, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes - Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor All Related Checks and Electronic Payment Requests Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent KROLL RESTRUCTURING ADMINISTRATION LLC Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketJudge Karen B. Owens added to case (SH) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion - Declaration of Aure Bruneau in Support of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Requests for First Day Relief Filed By Stimwave Technologies Incorporated (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Stimwave Technologies Incorporated. (Magaziner, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stimwave Technologies Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant