This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/04/2020 at 06:32:51 (UTC).

Stamatina Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Stamatina Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-41538

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtors

Stamatina Holdings, LLC

Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Debtor

905 Westminster Avenue

Murphy, TX 75094

Trustee

Mark A WEISBART (SBRA V)

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gerrit M. Pronske

Attorney at Pronske & Kathman, P.C.

2701 Dallas Parkway, Suite 590

Plano, TX 75093

Trustee Attorney

Mark A. Weisbart

Attorney at The Law Office of Mark A. Weisbart

12770 Coit Road, Suite 541

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorney

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#49

48 #2

Exhibit Exhibits

48 #1

Main Document

#44

#41

#40

29 #5

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay

29 #4

Affidavit Affidavit of Laura P. Haley

29 #3

Exhibit Certified Copies of Records from the Texas Secretary of State

29 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of David A. Buttross

29 #1

Main Document

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#29 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way Filed by JTREO, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of David A. Buttross # 2 Exhibit Certified Copies of Records from the Texas Secretary of State # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Laura P. Haley # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay) filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc.). (Clontz, Megan) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by JTREO, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#29 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way Filed by JTREO, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of David A. Buttross # 2 Exhibit Certified Copies of Records from the Texas Secretary of State # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Laura P. Haley # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay) filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc., #44 A telephonic Final hearing will be held on 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc. filed as document number #29.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Brownfeld, Gail) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#39 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC Document Due 08/31/2020. filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC, #40 Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC Document Due 08/31/2020. filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC, #41 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 4,000.00 Amount Paid $ 4,000.00 Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#44 A telephonic Final hearing will be held on 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc. filed as document number #29.). Notice Date 08/29/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#42 A telephonic hearing will be held on 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Examine Debtor's Transactions with Attorney (Sec. 329, BR 2017) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38.). Notice Date 08/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) A telephonic Final hearing will be held on 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc. filed as document number #29. (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Objection Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#29 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property 2700 Al Lipscomb Way Filed by JTREO, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of David A. Buttross # 2 Exhibit Certified Copies of Records from the Texas Secretary of State # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Laura P. Haley # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay) filed by Creditor JTREO, Inc.). (Clontz, Megan) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketHearing Held: 1111(b) deadline set for 14 days from Confirmation Hearing Status hearing held. (RE: related document(s) #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Document Due 07/13/2020.). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) A telephonic hearing will be held on 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Examine Debtor's Transactions with Attorney (Sec. 329, BR 2017) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38. (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 4,000.00 Amount Paid $ 4,000.00 Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 11:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 11/3/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/4/2021. (lc)). Notice Date 07/09/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Document Due 07/13/2020. filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC Document Due 07/15/2020. filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Dallas County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:Debtor Chooses to Proceed Under Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Document Due 07/13/2020. filed by Debtor Stamatina Holdings, LLC). Document Due 07/15/2020. (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMatrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC Document Due 07/15/2020. (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-41538) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11665172, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 07/20/2020. (lc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Meeting of Creditors - Renotice Only - Telephonic Hearing Instructions 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 11:30 AM (check with U.S. Trustee for location). (lc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2020 at 11:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 11/3/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/4/2021. (lc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Stamatina Holdings, LLC, Document Due 07/13/2020.(Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAMATINA HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant