This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/27/2020 at 06:50:31 (UTC).

St. Vincent Medical Center et al v. Cochlear Americas Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 St Vincent Medical Center filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Cochlear Americas Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01515

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

St. Vincent Medical Center

2131 West Third Street

Los Angeles, CA 90057

O'Connor Hospital

2105 Forest Avenue

San Jose, CA 95128

Defendant

Cochlear Americas Corporation

10350 Park Meadows Drive

Lone Tree, CO 80124

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Dr Ste 400

St Paul, MN 55121

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figuerora Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

#3

Scheduling Order

3 #2

Order Re: Courtroom Procedures

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on Cochlear Americas Corporation Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #4

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital) Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures #2 Scheduling Order) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Cochlear Americas Corporation Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01515-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01515. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital against Cochlear Americas Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COCHLEAR AMERICAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where O'Connor Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Vincent Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant