This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/17/2022 at 06:22:25 (UTC).

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 v. The Kings Midwest Division, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 St Alexius Hospital Corporation 1 filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against The Kings Midwest Division, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-06012

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1

3933 S Broadway

St Louis, MO 63118

Defendant

The Kings Midwest Division, LLC

311 N. Lindebergh Blvd., Suite 115

St. Louis, MO 63141

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E. Prince

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000, Key Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Exhibit Entry of Default

6 #3

Exhibit Declaration

#7

(#7) Clerk's Entry of Default, The Kings Midwest Division, LLC. (rah) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #7 Clerk's Entry of Default). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

9 #1

Main Document

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Scott E. Prince Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 in Support of

#10

(#10) Proposed Order submitted by Scott E. Prince on behalf of St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 (RE: related document(s)#9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAdversary Proceeding 22-6012 Closed. (rah) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment (Related Doc #9). (lmu) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Order submitted by Scott E. Prince on behalf of St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 (RE: related document(s)#9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for Default Judgment against The Kings Midwest Division, LLC, filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Declaration of Scott E. Prince Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 in Support of Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Default) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #7 Clerk's Entry of Default). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Entry of Default, The Kings Midwest Division, LLC. (rah) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Default #2 Exhibit Declaration) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 22-06012-grs) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11072978, amount $ 350.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 22-06012. Complaint, filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 against The Kings Midwest Division, LLC Fee Amount 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST ALEXIUS HOSPITAL CORPORATION #1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Prince