This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/02/2022 at 06:19:36 (UTC).

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 v. Stryker Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 St Alexius Hospital Corporation 1 filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-06017

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1

3933 S Broadway

St Louis, MO 63118

Defendant

Stryker Corporation

2825 Airview Blvd.

Kalamazoo, MI 49002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E. Prince

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000, Key Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Exhibit Declaration Confirming Correct Spelling of the Defendant's Name

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #3 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#6 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Dismissal Filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1. (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAdversary Proceeding 22-6017 Closed. (rah) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Dismissal Filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1. (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#6 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #3 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing Declaration Confirming Correct Spelling of the Defendant's Name Filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Confirming Correct Spelling of the Defendant's Name)(Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Deficiency - Action RequiredIt appearing to the Court that the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) record and the Complaint [ECF No. #1], contain(s) the following discrepancy(ies): The name and/or alias listed on the PDF document do(es) not match what appears in the ECF system for Defendant Stryker Corporation. It is ORDERED that, within 7 days from the entry of this Order, the above-listed discrepancy(ies) shall be corrected by filing: An amended PDF document if the error was contained within the Complaint. ORAn affidavit stating what the correct information should be if the error was made by failing to enter, or incorrectly entering, the information into the ECF system. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 4/18/2022.(alf)This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 22-06017-grs) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11073033, amount $ 350.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 22-06017. Complaint, filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 against Stryker Corporation Fee Amount 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST ALEXIUS HOSPITAL CORPORATION #1 is a litigant

Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Prince