This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/19/2022 at 06:42:36 (UTC).

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 v. Stericycle, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 St Alexius Hospital Corporation 1 filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Stericycle, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-06016

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1

3933 S Broadway

St Louis, MO 63118

Defendant

Stericycle, Inc.

28161 North Keith Drive

Lake Forest, IL 60045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E. Prince

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000, Key Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Scheduling Status Hearing and Vacating Order for Trial. Status Hearing to be held on 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#7

(#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2022 9:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 1693 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:03 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#8

(#8) Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Setting Hearing). (alf) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#9

(#9) Order Remanding Status Hearing Order (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Setting Hearing) (alf) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#10

(#10) Order (bjp) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order (bjp) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Remanding Status Hearing Order (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Setting Hearing) (alf) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Order Setting Hearing). (alf) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2022 9:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 1693 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:03 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Scheduling Status Hearing and Vacating Order for Trial. Status Hearing to be held on 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 22-06016-grs) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11073033, amount $ 350.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 22-06016. Complaint, filed by St. Alexius Hospital Corporation #1 against Stericycle, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST ALEXIUS HOSPITAL CORPORATION #1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Stericycle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Prince