This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/16/2021 at 06:31:47 (UTC).

SSRE Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 SSRE Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-10327

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

SSRE Holdings, LLC

1435 N Harbor Blvd #43

Fullerton, CA 92835

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Stephen R Wade

Attorney at The Law Offices of Stephen R Wade

405 North Indian Hill Blvd.

Claremont, CA 91711

Us Trustee Attorney

Dare Law

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#92

#91

#90

#88

#87

#86

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#85

#84

#83

#81

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#80

#79

#78

#77

#76

#75

#73

#72

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Notice of transcripts Appellee's Notice of Transcript(s) Designated for an Appeal Filed by Creditor PMC Financial Services Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#69 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Appellee PMC Financial Services Group, LLC's Counter-Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by Creditor PMC Financial Services Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#69 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Filed by Stockholder Zirkle Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#69 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Baum, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 21-WB-11. RE Hearing Date: 02/04/2021, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMAPANY INC, Telephone number 13104104151.] (RE: related document(s)#87 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC) (Kaaumoana, William) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal , Statement of Issues on Appeal Filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#69 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). Appellee designation due by 03/15/2021. Transmission of Designation Due by 03/31/2021. (Wade, Stephen) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Transcript Order Form related to an Appeal, regarding Hearing Date 02/04/2021 Filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC. (Wade, Stephen) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/17/21 RE: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 05/24/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMPANY, INC., Telephone number 310-410-4151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/1/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/25/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/24/2021. (Steinhauer, Holly) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#79 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#73 Motion for relief from the automatic stay PERSONAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#72 Order on Motion To Dismiss Debtor - Joint Debtor (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Addendum to voluntary petition holographic signature Filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC. (Wade, Stephen) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy Emailed to srw@srwadelaw.com (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Request for a Certified Copy(2:21-bk-10327-WB) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52333880. Fee amount 11.00. (re: Doc# 4 ) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. The document will be sent via email to :srw@srwadelaw.com: Filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Wade, Stephen) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) - Case also deficient for: List of Equity Security Holders due 01/29/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/29/2021. A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/29/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/29/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/29/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/29/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/29/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/29/2021. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC) (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . All documents requiring debtor(s) signature in the petition and all other deficient documents must be holographic as of 12/1/2017, pursuant to LBR 9011.1/Court Manual Section 3.4. Case also deficient for: Holographic Signature of Debtor(s) on Petition (Official Form 101 or 201) due by 1/22/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for NonIndividual Debtors (Official Form 202) Declaration (Signed) due by 1/22/2021. (Ly, Lynn). Note: 72 Hours Deficiency Has Been Cured. Modified on 1/21/2021 (Ly, Lynn). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:21-bk-10327) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52327469. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC) Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/29/2021. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/29/2021. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/29/2021. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SSRE Holdings, LLC) List of Equity Security Holders due 1/29/2021. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by SSRE Holdings, LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/29/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/29/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/29/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/29/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/29/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/29/2021. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/29/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/29/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/29/2021. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/29/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 01/29/2021. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 04/15/2021. (Wade, Stephen). Warning: See docket entries no #2 and #3 for corrective actions. All documents requiring debtor(s) signature in the petition and all other deficient documents must be holographic as of 12/1/2017, pursuant to LBR 9011.1/Court Manual Section 3.4. Case also deficient for: List of Equity Security Holders due 01/29/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/29/2021. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/29/2021. Holographic Signature of Debtor(s) on Petition (Official Form 101 or 201) due by 1/22/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Declaration (Signed) due by 1/22/2021. Modified on 1/19/2021 (Ly, Lynn). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R Wade