Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 06:35:08 (UTC).

SPT Distribution Company, Inc. Jointly Administered under 20-33163.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 SPT Distribution Company, Inc Jointly Administered under 20-33163 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-33177

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

SPT Distribution Company, Inc. Jointly Administered under 20-33163.

SPT Distribution Company, Inc.

7215 S.W. Topeka Boulevard, Bldg 6D

Topeka, KS 66619

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Clifford William Carlson

Attorney at Weil Gotshal Manges LLP

700 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Alfredo R Perez

Attorney at Weil Gotshal et al

700 Louisiana, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33163. Signed on 6/25/2020 (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#2

Ex. A - Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by SPT Distribution Company, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-33177) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22226899. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketJudge Marvin Isgur is added to the case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones is terminated. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33163 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33163. Signed on 6/25/2020 (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) and Local Rule 1015-1 for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor SPT Distribution Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed Order) (Carlson, Clifford) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by SPT Distribution Company, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clifford William Carlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo R Perez